EP1873156 - Process for the preparation of 6-[[(alkoxy)carbonyl]amino]-9H-Purine-9-acetic acid and 4-[(alkoxycarbonyl)amino]-2-oxo-1(2H)-Pyrimidineacetic acid derivatives as synthons for the synthesis of peptide nucleic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERSEPTIVE BIOSYSTEMS, INC. 500 Old Connecticut Path Framingham Massachusetts 01701 / US | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coull, James M 7 Banbury Drive Westford MA 01884 / US | 02 /
Egholm, Michael 11 Highview Road Madison, CT 06443 / US | 03 /
Hodge, Richard P 8462 Hogan Drive SE Huntsville AL 35802 / US | 04 /
Ismail, Mohamed 5 Hunt Road Bedford MA 01730 / US | 05 /
Rajur, S B 36 Westgate Road 5 Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | [2008/24] |
Former [2008/11] | 01 /
Coull, James M 7 Banbury Drive Westford MA 01884 / US | ||
02 /
Egholm, Michael 11 Highview Road Madison, CT 06443 / US | |||
03 /
Hodge, Richard P 8462 Hogan Drive SE Huntsville AL 35802 / US | |||
04 /
Ismail, Mohamed 5 Hunt Road Bedford MA 01730 / US | |||
05 /
Rajur, S B 36 Westgate Road 5 Chestnut Hill MA 02167 / US | |||
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
Coull, James M 7 Banbury Drive Westford MA 01884 / US | ||
02 /
Egholm, Michael 1231 Lexington Ridge Drive Lexington MA 02173 / US | |||
03 /
Hodge, Richard P 8462 Hogan Drive SE Huntsville AL 35802 / US | |||
04 /
Ismail, Mohamed 5 Hunt Road Bedford MA 01730 / US | |||
05 /
Rajur, S B 36 Westgate Road 5 Chestnut Hill MA 02167 / US | Representative(s) | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07016616.0 | 06.06.1996 | [2008/01] | Priority number, date | US19950487666 | 07.06.1995 Original published format: US 487666 | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873156 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/34, C07D239/46, C07D473/18, C07D473/40 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
C07D239/47 (EP,US);
C07D473/18 (EP,US);
C07D473/34 (EP,US);
C07D473/40 (EP,US);
C07K14/003 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 6-[[(Alkoxy)carbonyl]amino]-9H-Purin-9-Essigsäure und 4-[(Alkoxycarbonyl)amino]-2-oxo-1(2H)-Pyrimidin-Essigsäure Derivaten als Synthesebausteine zur Herstellung von Peptid-Nukleinsäuren | [2008/01] | English: | Process for the preparation of 6-[[(alkoxy)carbonyl]amino]-9H-Purine-9-acetic acid and 4-[(alkoxycarbonyl)amino]-2-oxo-1(2H)-Pyrimidineacetic acid derivatives as synthons for the synthesis of peptide nucleic acids | [2008/01] | French: | Procedé pour la preparation de derivés 6-[[(alkoxy)carbonyl]amino]-9H-Purine-9-acide acétique et 4-[(alkoxycarbonyl)amino]-2-oxo-1(2H)-Pyrimidine-acide acétique en tant que synthons pour la synthèse d'acides nucléiques peptidiques | [2008/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/35] | 10.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96918202.1 / EP0840736 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960918202) is 21.01.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO9220702 (BUCHARDT OLE [DK], et al) [XD] 1-33 * figure 14 * * examples 30-32 *; | [X]WO9312129 (GLAXO INC [US]) [X] 1-33 * schemes 4 and 6 * * examples 4,6 *; | [X] - DUEHOLM K L ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF PEPTIDE NUCLEIC ACID MONOMERS CONTAINING THE FOUR NATURAL NUCLEOBASES: THYMINE, CYTOSINE, ADENINE, AND GUANINE AND THEIR OLIGOMERIZATION", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (1994), vol. 59, no. 19, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 5767 - 5773, XP002069737 [X] 1-33 * page 5768, scheme 2, preparation of compound 2c from compound 7, preparation of compound 7 from compound 6 * * page 6768, scheme 1, preparation of compound 2b from compound 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00098a042 | [X] - EGHOLM M ET AL, "RECOGNITION OF GUANINE AND ADENINE IN DNA BY CYTOSINE AND THYMINE CONTAINING PEPTIDE NUCLEIC ACIDS (PNA)", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1992), vol. 114, no. 92, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 9677 - 9678, XP002069736 [X] 1-33 * page 9678, preparation of compound 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00050a068 | [Y] - THOMSON S A ET AL, "FMOC MEDIATED SYNTHESIS OF PEPTIDE NUCLEIC ACIDS", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950529), vol. 51, no. 22, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 6179 - 6194, XP002030024 [Y] 1-33 * pages 6181, 6185, 6186, process step f, preparation of compound 4 from compound 11 * * pages 6181, 6185, 6186, process step c, preparation of compound 3 from compound 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4020(95)00286-H | [Y] - EGHOLM M ET AL, "PEPTIDE NUCLEIC ACIDS CONTAINING ADENINE OR GUANINE RECOGNIZE THYMINE AND CYTOSINE IN COMPLEMENTARY DNA SEQUENCES", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, GB, (1993), ISSN 0022-4936, pages 800 - 804, XP000916569 [Y] 1-33 * pages 800-801, preparation of compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c39930000800 | by applicant | - CHEM. SOC., (1965), vol. 87, page 4646 | - TRAMANTANO ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 234, page 1566 | - POLLACK ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 234, page 1570 | - SHOKAT ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 338, page 269 | - HAHN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 248, page 1544 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1994), vol. 59, pages 5767 - 5773 | - EGHOLM, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1992), vol. 114, pages 9677 - 9678 | - THOMSON, TETRAHEDRON, vol. 51, no. 22, pages 6179 - 6194 | - J. CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COMMUN., (1993), pages 800 - 801 | - HODGE ET AL., ORG. CHEM, (1990), vol. 56, pages 1553 - 64 | WO1992EP01219 | WO1992EP01220 |