EP1903251 - Displacement device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stabilus GmbH Wallersheimer Weg 100 56070 Koblenz / DE | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Görgen, Andreas In der Weglänge 9 56072 Koblenz / DE | 02 /
Frye, Hartwig Antonius-Strasse 16 56218 Mühlheim-Kärlich / DE | [2008/13] | Application number, filing date | 07016977.6 | 30.08.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | DE20061044608 | 19.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006044608 | DE20071024104 | 22.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007024104 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1903251 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1903251 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/02 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
F16F9/0272 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | TR [2016/39] |
Former [2008/49] | TR | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verstelleinrichtung | [2008/13] | English: | Displacement device | [2008/13] | French: | Dispositif de réglage | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 27.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 13.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 28.09.2016 | [2020/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005156366 (MULLER THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042] * [Y] 22; | [Y]DE29521309U (STABILUS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 22 * figure 3a *; | [A]US2002017748 (SANDER ARMIN [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 2-6 * | by applicant | US2005156366 | DE29521309U |