EP1918688 - Misfire detecting apparatus for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2010/21] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shikama, Mahito c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-Chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Tsukamoto, Toshinori c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-Chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2010/19] |
Former [2008/19] | 01 /
Shikama, Mahito Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-Chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | ||
02 /
Tsukamoto, Toshinori Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-Chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann, Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017032.9 | 30.08.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | JP20060294114 | 30.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006294114 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1918688 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1918688 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01M15/11 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
G01M15/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/03] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erkennen von Fehlzündungen für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [2008/19] | English: | Misfire detecting apparatus for internal combustion engine | [2008/19] | French: | Appareil de détection de raté d'allumage pour moteur à combustion interne | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5377537 (JAMES JOHN V [US]) [DA] 1-6* the whole document *; | [Y]US5528931 (JAMES JOHN V [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * figure 8 * * column 3, lines 31-41 * * column 4, lines 63-67 * * column 5, lines 46-50 * * column 6, lines 1-5,28-36 * * column 9, lines 46-51 * * column 10, lines 61-67 * * column 11, lines 8-10 * * column 12, lines 11-14 *; | [Y]EP1677092 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0044] * | by applicant | JPH07151009 | US5528931 | EP1677092 |