EP2031358 - Method for monitoring a material flowing through a duct [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Bühler AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheiwiller, Thomas Mettlenstrasse, 14A Zuzwil, 9524 / CH | 02 /
Pierri, Dario Schwalbenstrasse,8 9000, St Gallen / CH | 03 /
Erhardt, Daniel Im Kessler, 2 8902, Urdorf ZH / CH | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2011/27] |
Former [2009/28] | Wilming, Martin Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | ||
Former [2009/10] | Frommhold, Joachim Bühler AG Patentabteilung 9240 Uzwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 07017079.0 | 31.08.2007 | [2009/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031358 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/704, // G01N27/22 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
G01N27/223 (EP);
G01F1/7046 (EP);
G01F1/712 (EP);
G01F1/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Überwachung eines durch einen Kanal fließenden Materials | [2009/10] | English: | Method for monitoring a material flowing through a duct | [2009/10] | French: | Procédé de surveillance de matériel circulant par un conduit | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2007 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2313196 (WESTERN ATLAS INT INC [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 2, line 19 - line 27 * * figure 1 * * page 4, line 18 - line 28 * * page 5, line 10 - line 12 * * page 6, line 3 - line 28; figure 2 *; | [A]WO0165212 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [A] 11,12 * page 2, line 12 - line 20 * * page 5, line 4 - page 6, line 5 * * page 8, line 32 - page 9, line 28 * * page 8, line 11 - line 23 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2006132546 (ROXAR FLOW MEASUREMENT AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1a,1b * * paragraph [0035]; figure 3 * | [XA] - YANG W Q ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT OF CAPACITANCE TOMOGRAPHIC IMAGING SYSTEMS FOR OIL PIPELINE MEASUREMENTS", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19950801), vol. 66, no. 8, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 4326 - 4332, XP000525639 [X] 21,22 * page 4326 * * figures 5,8,11 * [A] 3-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1145322 | by applicant | GB2313196 | - YANG W.Q. ET AL., "Development of capacitance tomographic imaging systems for oil pipeline measurements", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, (19950801), vol. 66, no. 8, pages 4326 - 4332 |