EP1908813 - Liquid crystalline medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2008/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wittek, Michael, Dr. Roquetteweg 3 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Lietzau, Lars, Dr. Ingelheimer Strasse 3 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [2010/44] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
Wittek, Michael, Dr. Roquetteweg 3 64285 Darmstadt / DE | ||
02 /
Lietzau, Lars, Dr. Ingelheimer Strasse 3 64285 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017453.7 | 06.09.2007 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | DE20061046906 | 04.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006046906 | [2008/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908813 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1908813 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/34, C09K19/42 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
C09K19/3402 (EP,US);
C09K19/04 (KR);
C09K19/42 (EP,US);
C09K2019/0466 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3071 (EP,US);
C09K2019/3422 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallines Medium | [2008/15] | English: | Liquid crystalline medium | [2008/15] | French: | Milieu cristallin liquide | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10008826.9 / EP2248872 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | HU | 03.11.2010 | IE | 03.11.2010 | IT | 03.11.2010 | LT | 03.11.2010 | LV | 03.11.2010 | MT | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | PL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | BG | 03.02.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | ES | 14.02.2011 | IS | 03.03.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CZ | 03.11.2010 | |
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
MT | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CZ | 03.11.2010 | |
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 03.11.2010 | |
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 03.11.2010 | |
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 03.11.2010 | |
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
IE | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 03.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1335014 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021] - [0046] , [0050] - [0066]; compounds II-VI * * examples M1-M10 ** claim -; compound IA.25 *; | [X]US2005040365 (HECKMEIER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0035] - [0065] , [0072] , [0074]; compounds II-VI * * paragraphs [0108] - [0117] - [0132] - [0135] * * examples M1-M10; compounds CGUQU, CPUQU, CUQU, PUQU, CCZU, CC, CCEU * * claim -; compound IA.25 *; | [X]WO2005017067 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 5, line 21 - page 8, line 4 * * page 13, line 20 - page 15, line 21 * * pages 21-23; compounds IA.37- IA.39, IA.41, IA.42 * * pages 24-26; compounds IA.50, IA.51, IA.53, IA.54, II-VI * * page 33; compound O1 * * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2005081215 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * examples 11,14; compounds AUUQU, AGUQU, APUQU, CDUQU * * claim -; compounds I.A-I.L, II.A-II.E *; | [X]WO2005123879 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 7, line 19 - page 10, line 15 * * pages 27-30; compounds IB.1-IB.4, IB.9-IB.22 * * pages 33-34; compounds II-VI * * examples M1-M18; compounds APUQU, CCQU, PUQU, CC, CCP, CCZU * * claim -; compound IB.29 *; | [X]DE102005027762 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * example -; claim -; compound IB.29 *; | [PX]US2006278850 (CZANTA MARKUS [DE], et al) [PX] 1-7,10-12 * example 8; compound ADUQU * * claim -; compound II *; | [PX]DE102006047128 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-7,10-12 * page 11; compounds II.29 - II.32 * * example -; claim -; compounds I-IV *; | [PX]DE102006052123 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-7,10-12 * example -; claim -; compounds K.11, II-VI, K.1-K.6 *; | [PX]EP1813662 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-3,7,10-12 * example -; compounds CAUQU, PUQU, CCP, CC * * claim -; compounds I.1-I.3 *; | [E]EP1832643 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-7,10-12 * example -; claim -; compounds K.11, II-VI, K.1-K.6 * |