EP1903665 - A method for fastening permanent magnet magnetic poles to the rotor of an electric machine, rotor and mould for fastening the permanent magnets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/13] | A method for fastening permanent magnet magnetic poles to the rotor of an electric machine | ||
[2015/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2017 [2017/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VENSYS Energy AG Im Langental 6 66539 Neunkirchen / DE | [2009/20] |
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states VENSYS Energy AG Saar-Lor-Lux-Straße 15 66115 Saarbrücken / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rinck, Jürgen Rühleweg 7 66399 Mandelbachtal / DE | 02 /
Herrmann, Axel Saargemünder Straße 28 66119 Saarbrücken / DE | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Bernhardt, Reinhold Patentanwälte Bernhardt/Wolff Partnerschaft mbB Europaallee 17 66113 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Bernhardt, Reinhold Patentanwälte Bernhardt/Wolff Partnerschaft Europaallee 17 66113 Saarbrücken / DE | ||
Former [2012/01] | Bernhardt, Reinhold Kobenhüttenweg 43 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | Bernhardt, Reinold Kobenhüttenweg 43 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017625.0 | 08.09.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | DE20061044268 | 20.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006044268 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903665 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1903665 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | [2011/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1903665 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/03, // H02K15/12, H02K1/27, H02K7/18 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
H02K15/03 (EP);
H02K1/2788 (EP,US);
H02K15/12 (EP);
H02K7/1838 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | H02K15/03, // H02K15/12, H02K1/27 | ||
Former IPC [2008/13] | H02K15/03 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2011/42] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Befestigung Magnetpole bildender Permanentmagnete am Läufer einer elektrischen Maschine, Läufer und Formelement zur Befestigung der Permanentmagnete | [2015/45] | English: | A method for fastening permanent magnet magnetic poles to the rotor of an electric machine, rotor and mould for fastening the permanent magnets | [2015/39] | French: | Procédé de fixation des pôles magnétiques en aimants sur le rotor d'une machine électrique, rotor et moule de fixation des aimants | [2015/39] |
Former [2008/13] | Verfahren zur Befestigung Magnetpole bildender Permanentmagneten am Läufer einer elektrischen Maschine | ||
Former [2008/13] | A method for fastening permanent magnet magnetic poles to the rotor of an electric machine | ||
Former [2008/13] | Procédé de fixation des pôles magnétiques en aimants sur le rotor d'une machine électrique | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 17.08.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2707813 (MITSUBA ELECTRIC MFG CO [JP]) [A] 1* figure 4A *; | [XI]US2002158532 (UEMURA FUMITO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,13 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] * [I] 2,4-8,11,12,14; | [A]EP1536543 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 8A * * paragraph [0020] * | by applicant | DE3913618 | EP0410048 | US2002158532 | EP1473816 |