EP1902902 - Cover element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Decoma (Germany) GmbH 66280 Sulzbach / DE | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Münker, Klaus Im Wengert 8 72127 Jettenburg / DE | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/43] |
Former [2008/13] | Lehmann, Judith Christina Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017644.1 | 10.09.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | DE20061046436 | 25.09.2006 Original published format: DE102006046436 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902902 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902902 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02, H01Q1/40 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
B29C45/1671 (EP);
B60R13/005 (EP);
H01Q1/3233 (EP);
H01Q1/42 (EP);
B29C2045/0093 (EP);
G01S2013/93271 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2008/49] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abdeckelement | [2008/13] | English: | Cover element | [2008/13] | French: | Elément de revêtement | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.07.2010 | ES | 01.11.2010 | [2011/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]DE10026454 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [DX] 1-5,7,11,12,15,16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0017] - [0019]; figure 3 *; | [X]DE19844021 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-7,12 * column 1, line 17 - column 2, line 42; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [DX]DE102004050501 (FREEGLASS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [DX] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19819709 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [DA] 1,8-10,12-14 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015]; figures 1-3; claims 6,9 *; | [A]DE10338506 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) | by applicant | DE10026454 |