EP1905928 - Door-locking system for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/14] | Door-looking knob construction of vehicle | ||
[2008/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | ||
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soda, Masaki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017672.2 | 10.09.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | JP20060260886 | 26.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006260886 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1905928 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1905928 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1905928 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20, E05B41/00, E05B5/00 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
E05B85/13 (EP,US);
E05B41/00 (EP,US);
E05B85/12 (EP,US);
Y10T292/57 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/14] | E05B65/20, E05B41/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/51] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Türverriegelungssystem für ein Fahrzeug | [2009/24] | English: | Door-locking system for a vehicle | [2009/24] | French: | Système de verrouillage de porte pour véhicule | [2009/24] |
Former [2008/14] | Türverschlussknopfkonstruktion für ein Fahrzeug | ||
Former [2008/14] | Door-looking knob construction of vehicle | ||
Former [2008/14] | Construction de poignée de verrouillage de porte pour véhicule | Examination procedure | 10.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2363060 (OPEL ADAM AG) [A] 1,2* page 6, lines 4-9; figures 1-4 *; | [X]FR2359457 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 21; figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP1101892 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1,5 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020]; claim 2 *; | [X]US2004212200 (KAKITA KOUSUKE [JP]) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0018]; figure 5A * |