EP1909207 - Measuring range extension of chromatographic quick tests [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | |||
Former [2008/15] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MT
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 112-132 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spinke, Jürgen Magnolienstrasse 29 64653 Lorsch / DE | 02 /
Thiele, Marcel Mannheimer Strasse 95 68309 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Schäffler, Jürgen Gundelbachstrasse 112B 69469 Weinheim / DE | 04 /
Nufer, Andreas In der Silz 5B 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | [2014/45] |
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
Spinke, Jürgen Magnolienstrasse 29 64653 Lorsch / DE | ||
02 /
Thiele, Marcel Mannheimer Strasse 95 68309 Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
Schäffler, Jürgen Gundelbachstrasse 112 B 69469 Weinheim / DE | |||
04 /
Nufer, Andreas In der Silz 5 B 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017673.0 | 10.09.2007 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | EP20060019008 | 11.09.2006 Original published format: EP 06019008 | [2008/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1909207 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1909207 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
G01N33/54386 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | G06F19/00, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | Messbereichserweiterung chromatografischer Schnellteste | [2008/15] | English: | Measuring range extension of chromatographic quick tests | [2008/15] | French: | Agrandissement de l'étendue de mesure d'essais chromatographiques rapides | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2014 | 22.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2007 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | IE | 10.09.2015 | LU | 10.09.2015 | BE | 30.09.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/22] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 10.09.2015 | ||
LU | 10.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 10.09.2015 | ||
LU | 10.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 10.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 10.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 04.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9624062 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]); | [A]WO0045176 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al); | Examination | US2006089810 |