EP2037498 - High performance highly heat resistant semiconductor module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Birner, Martin Weiher 34 92242 Hirschau / DE | 02 /
Schierling, Hubert, Dr. Pommernstrasse 18 G 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2009/12] | Application number, filing date | 07017801.7 | 11.09.2007 | [2009/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2037498 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/42 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
H01L23/42 (EP);
H01L2224/40227 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L23/22 (EP);
H01L25/072 (EP);
H01L2924/00014 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/37099 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/12] | Title | German: | Hochwärmebeständiges Leistungshalbleitermodul | [2009/12] | English: | High performance highly heat resistant semiconductor module | [2009/12] | French: | Module semi-conducteur de puissance résistant à une chaleur importante | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/23] | 04.02.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB1047778 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1,4,6,9 * page 1, line 82 - page 2, line 108; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,3,5,7,8,10; | [XA]DE1439456 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 2; figure 1 * [A] 4,5,9,10; | [XA]US3462654 (WEINSTEIN HAROLD) [X] 1,4,6,9 * column 2, line 16 - line 72; figure 3 * [A] 2,3,5,7,8,10; | [A]DE2255837 (HERAEUS GMBH W C) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19922928 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 64; figure 1 *; | [XAY]DE10123232 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0046]; figure 1 * [A] 4,9 [Y] 2,3,5,7,8,10; | [A]WO03075626 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* page 5, line 14 - page 8, line 36; figures 1-4 * |