EP1936802 - High performance broadband amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2011/28] |
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salomon, Andreas Valerystrasse 4B 85716 Unterschleissheim / DE | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Riegel, Werner Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Patentabteilung 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Riegel, Werner EADS Deutschland GmbH, Patentabtlg.., DSLAIP1 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017833.0 | 12.09.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | DE20061052611 | 08.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006052611 | [2008/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1936802 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1936802 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/60 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
H03F3/604 (EP,US);
H03F2200/192 (EP,US);
H03F2200/204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/10] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leistungsbreitbandverstärker | [2008/26] | English: | High performance broadband amplifier | [2008/26] | French: | Amplificateur de puissance à large bande | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 30.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE2807813 (SIEMENS AG) [DA] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US4656434 (SELIN JOHN R [US]) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [DA]DE3709169 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [DA] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH02111111 (SONY CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0064048 (LAUREANTI STEVEN [US]) [Y] 1,3 * page 13, line 19 - line 22; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6496061 (BLOOM MARK [US], et al) [Y] 1,3 * column 5, line 20 - line 35; figure 2 * * column 6, line 54 - line 59 *; | [X]US2004189380 (MYER ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * paragraph [0005]; figure 3 *; | [Y]EP1521361 (LUCENT TECH NETWORK SYS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0073]; figure 2b *; | [X]WO2005088830 (FILTRONIC PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,3 * page 10, lines 10-15; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2006145761 (PRIBBLE WILLIAM L [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0009] , [0059] * | by applicant | DE3709169 | US2004189380 |