EP1921371 - Oil lubrication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOMAG GmbH Industriegebiet Hellerwald D-56154 Boppard / DE | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hammes, Manfred Falkenstrasse 14 56281 Emmelshausen / DE | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Lang, Friedrich, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Rosa-Bavarese-Strasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Lang, Friedrich, et al Lang & Tomerius Patentanwälte Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | Lang, Friedrich, et al Patentanwälte Lang & Tomerius Postfach 15 13 24 80048 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017900.7 | 12.09.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | DE20061053093 | 10.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006053093 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1921371 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1921371 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16N7/38, F01M1/02, F01M9/10, F02B67/04 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
F01M9/108 (EP,US);
F02B67/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/20] | F16N7/38, F01M1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | Ölschmierung | [2008/20] | English: | Oil lubrication | [2008/20] | French: | Lubrification | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 05.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 08.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB238879 (DAIMLER MOTOREN) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]DE2040211 (ROBUR WERKE LASTKRAFTWAGEN UND) [X] 1,6,7,9-14,16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3814368 (MANNESMANN AG, 4000 DUESSELDORF, DE) [A] 1,6,10,12,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0538508 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US6443263 (ITO KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]FR2848276 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1,6,10,12,14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1586750 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [A] 1,6,10,12,14 * the whole document * |