EP1860099 - Industrial process for the production of diphenyl sulfone compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SODA CO., LTD. 2-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8165 / JP | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawabe, Toru c/o Nihongi Plant, Nippon Soda Co., Ltd., 950 Oaza Fujisawa Nakago-mura Nakakubiki-gun Niigata 949-2392 / JP | 02 /
Sanpei, Syuichiro c/o Koriyama Plant, Koriyamakasei Co., Ltd. 176 Sasakawa 1-chome Koriyama Fukushima 963-0108 / JP | 03 /
Hanzawa, Masayuki c/o Koriyama Plant, Koriyamakasei Co., Ltd. 176 Sasakawa 1-chome Koriyama Fukushima 963-0108 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Yasuyuki c/o Koriyama Plant, Koriyamakasei Co., Ltd. 176 Sasakawa 1-chome Koriyama Fukushima 963-0108 / JP | 05 /
Kaeriyama, Minoru c/o R&D Laboratory Specialty Chem. Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 12-54 Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | 06 /
Hidaka, Tomoya c/o R&D Laboratory Specialty Chem. Nippon Soda Co., Ltd. 12-54 Goiminamikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 290-0045 / JP | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07018222.5 | 17.03.2000 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | JP19990078625 | 23.03.1999 Original published format: JP 7862599 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1860099 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1860099 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1860099 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C317/22, C07C315/04 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C07C315/04 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C315/04, C07C317/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/48] | Title | German: | Verarbeitungsprozess zur Herstellung von Diphenylsulfon-Verbindungen | [2007/48] | English: | Industrial process for the production of diphenyl sulfone compounds | [2007/48] | French: | Processus industriel pour la production de composants de diphényl sulfone | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 27.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00909706.4 / EP1164129 | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2010 | BE | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | GR | 04.02.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | IE | 17.03.2011 | LU | 17.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/26] |
Former [2013/25] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
IE | 17.03.2011 | ||
LU | 17.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
IE | 17.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4568766 (YAHAGI MASAKICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 5 - line 13; example 5; claim - * | by applicant | JPS5820493 | JPS5882788 | JPS6013852 | JPS6056949 | US4568766 | WO9111433 |