EP1905649 - Camera Apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Tatsumaro c/o ALPS Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7, Yukigaya-Otsuka-Cho Ota-ku, Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2011/32] |
Former [2008/14] | 01 /
Yamashita, Tatsumaro ALPS Electric Co., Ltd. 1-7, Yukigaya-Otsuka-Cho Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich Patentanwälte Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07018487.4 | 20.09.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | JP20060262535 | 27.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006262535 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1905649 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1905649 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1905649 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/04, B60R1/12, H04N5/225 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
B60R11/04 (EP,US);
G02B7/021 (EP,US);
G03B17/02 (EP,US);
G03B17/08 (EP,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
H04N23/57 (EP,US);
B60R2001/1253 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/29] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kameravorrichtung | [2008/14] | English: | Camera Apparatus | [2008/14] | French: | Appareil pour caméra | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 19.05.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.06.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1595611 (NIPPON KOGAKU K.K.) [X] 1 * page 9, line 19 - line 39; figure 13 *; | [DA]JP2004182040 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [XA]US2005206780 (IWASAKI KEIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0044] , [0045] , [0047] - [0049]; figures 7,8 * [A] 3-5; | [E]EP2054270 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [E] 1 * page 10 - page 14; figure 2 * | by applicant | JP2004182040 |