EP1914949 - Method for analysing a digitally modulated signal and signal analysis device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kühne, Jens Wallbergstrasse 8E 85560 Ebersberg / DE | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Beder, Jens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | Beder, Jens, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Beder, Jens, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent-und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07018506.1 | 20.09.2007 | [2008/17] | Priority number, date | DE20061049360 | 19.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006049360 | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1914949 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1914949 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1914949 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/00 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
H04L27/0012 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/46] |
Former [2008/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Analyse eines digital modulierten Signals und Signalanalysevorrichtung | [2008/17] | English: | Method for analysing a digitally modulated signal and signal analysis device | [2008/17] | French: | Procédé d'analyse d'un signal modulé numériquement et dispositif d'analyse de signal | [2008/17] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 30.09.2017 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2018 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4597107 (READY PATRICK J [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * column 2, line 39 - line 65 ** column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 52 *; | [Y]US6240282 (KLEIDER JOHN ERIC [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - line 62 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 45 * * column 8, line 30 - line 37 * * column 18, line 49 - column 19, line 41 * * column 21, line 38 - line 58 *; | [I] - LÓPEZ-RISUEÑO G ET AL, "Atomic decomposition-based radar complex signal interception - Time-frequency analysis for synthetic aperture radar and feature extraction", IEE PROCEEDINGS: RADAR, SONAR & NAVIGATION, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, GB, (20030801), vol. 150, no. 4, doi:10.1049/IP-RSN:20030680, ISSN 1350-2395, pages 323 - 331, XP006021035 [I] 1-30 * abstract * * Abschnitte 1, 2, 3, 4.1, 5, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-rsn:20030680 | [Y] - NAGY P A J ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "A MODULATION CLASSIFIER FOR MULTI CHANNEL SYSTEMS AND MULTI TRANSMITTER SITUATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (MILCOM). LONG BRANCH, NJ., OCT. 2 - 5, 1994; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (MILCOM)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19941002), vol. 3 OF 03, ISBN 978-0-7803-1829-8, pages 816 - 820, XP000505981 [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * Abschnitte 1, 2, 3 * |