EP1923373 - Method for manufacturing honeycomb structured body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibiden Co., Ltd. 1 Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8604 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 1 Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8604 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohno, Kazushige Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogaki Kita Plant 1-1, Kitagata Ibigawacho Ibi-gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 02 /
Ido, Takahiko Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogaki Kita Plant 1-1, Kitagata Ibigawacho Ibi-gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 03 /
Kasai, Chizuru Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogaki Kita Plant 1-1, Kitagata Ibigawacho Ibi-gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07018608.5 | 21.09.2007 | [2008/21] | Priority number, date | WO2006JP322878 | 16.11.2006 Original published format: PCT/JP2006/322878 | WO2006JP324983 | 14.12.2006 Original published format: PCT/JP2006/324983 | [2008/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1923373 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1923373 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/80, C04B38/00 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
C04B35/117 (EP);
C04B35/6303 (EP);
C04B35/6316 (EP);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B35/82 (EP);
C04B2235/3218 (EP);
C04B2235/322 (EP);
C04B2235/3229 (EP);
C04B2235/3232 (EP);
C04B2235/3427 (EP);
C04B2235/349 (EP);
C04B2235/522 (EP);
C04B2235/5224 (EP);
C04B2235/5228 (EP);
C04B2235/5232 (EP);
C04B2235/5244 (EP);
C04B2235/526 (EP);
C04B2235/5264 (EP);
C04B2235/5276 (EP);
C04B2235/5296 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Körpers mit Wabenstruktur | [2008/21] | English: | Method for manufacturing honeycomb structured body | [2008/21] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un élément structuré en nid d'abeille | [2008/21] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 24.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.2010 | BE | 20.01.2010 | CY | 20.01.2010 | CZ | 20.01.2010 | DK | 20.01.2010 | EE | 20.01.2010 | FI | 20.01.2010 | IT | 20.01.2010 | LT | 20.01.2010 | LV | 20.01.2010 | MT | 20.01.2010 | NL | 20.01.2010 | PL | 20.01.2010 | RO | 20.01.2010 | SE | 20.01.2010 | SI | 20.01.2010 | SK | 20.01.2010 | TR | 20.01.2010 | BG | 20.04.2010 | GR | 21.04.2010 | ES | 01.05.2010 | IS | 20.05.2010 | PT | 20.05.2010 | HU | 21.07.2010 | IE | 21.09.2010 | LU | 21.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
MT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 21.09.2010 | ||
LU | 21.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
MT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
IE | 21.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
MT | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
IE | 21.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
IE | 21.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
BE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CY | 20.01.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 20.01.2010 | |
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 20.01.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1652831 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0030] * * examples 1-9 * * claims 1-14 *; | [X]US2006177629 (KUNIEDA MASAFUMI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0086] * * claims 1-26 *; | [PX]EP1738814 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0075] * * examples 1-5 ** claims 1-10 * |