EP1905390 - Artificial intervertebral disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aesculap Implant Systems, LLC 3773 Corporate Parkway Center Valley, PA 18034 / US | [2013/31] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states Aesculap Implant Systems, Inc. 3773 Corporate Parkway Center Valley, PA 18034 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richelsoph, Marc 7850 Stage Hills Boulevard Suite105 Bartlett Tennessee 38133 / US | [2013/28] |
Former [2008/14] | 01 /
Richelsoph, Marc 7850 Stage Hills Boulevard Suite105 Bartlett Tennessee 38133 / US | Representative(s) | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/14] | Jacob, Reuben Ellis, et al R G C Jenkins & Co., 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07018677.0 | 26.04.2004 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | US20030430861 | 06.05.2003 Original published format: US 430861 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1905390 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1905390 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1905390 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
A61F2/4425 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2817 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30014 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30383 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30426 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30448 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30495 (EP,US);
A61F2002/305 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30563 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30578 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30616 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30649 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30662 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30841 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30884 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30904 (EP,US);
A61F2002/443 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2220/005 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0018 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00029 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00179 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00796 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Title | German: | Künstliche Bandscheibe | [2008/14] | English: | Artificial intervertebral disc | [2008/14] | French: | Disque intervertébral artificiel | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04252415.7 / EP1475059 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040252415) is 14.06.2006 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.04.2004 | AT | 10.07.2013 | BE | 10.07.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | CY | 10.07.2013 | CZ | 10.07.2013 | DK | 10.07.2013 | EE | 10.07.2013 | FI | 10.07.2013 | MC | 10.07.2013 | NL | 10.07.2013 | PL | 10.07.2013 | RO | 10.07.2013 | SE | 10.07.2013 | SI | 10.07.2013 | SK | 10.07.2013 | TR | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.10.2013 | PT | 11.11.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 26.04.2004 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
MC | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
EE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
SK | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
RO | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
DK | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
NL | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.10.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
FI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PL | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 10.07.2013 | ||
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.07.2013 | |
BE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SE | 10.07.2013 | ||
SI | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | SI | 10.07.2013 | |
PT | 11.11.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 10.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2263842 (HOFFMANN DAIMLER SIEGFRIED DR) [X] 36-38,41 * figures 7-9 * * page 17, paragraph 1 - page 20, paragraph 1 * [A] 1-3,15-31,34,36; | [XA]EP0282161 (HEALTH & RESEARCH SERVICES INC [CA]) [X] 36 * figures 1,2,6-10; claims 1,7,18 * * column 3, line 1 - line 56 * * column 4, line 46 - line 50 * * column 6, line 25 - line 29 * [A] 1-3,14-18,21-34; | [XA]FR2694882 (SOFAMOR [FR]) [X] 35,36 * figure -; claims 1,2,6,8,9 * * page 6, line 16 - line 24 * * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 7 * [A] 1-8,10,21-31,34; | [X]US5674294 (BAINVILLE DANIEL [FR], et al) [X] 41 * figure - * * column 3, line 12 - line 52 *; | [A]US5782832 (LARSEN SCOTT W [US], et al) [A] 1-4,15,26-32 * figure - * * column 7, line 8 - column 8, line 7 * * column 3, line 65 - line 67 *; | [XA]WO0004851 (SPINAL DYNAMICS CORP [US], et al) [X] 35,36 * figure -; claims 1 3 6 7 9-11 * * page 4, line 26 - line 29 * [A] 1-5,14-17,24-29,31,32; | [XA]US6063121 (XAVIER RAVI [US], et al) [X] 36 * figure -; claims 1,2 * * column 4, line 6 - line 17 * * column 4, line 50 - line 54 * [A] 1-3,15,27-31,34; | [XA]WO0101893 (SPINE SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 35 * figures 1,2,6,7; claims 1,4,10,14,15 *[A] 1,2,4-6,9,11,14; | [XA]FR2799638 (ZACOUTO FRED [FR]) [X] 36 * figures 1,14-16 * * page 5, line 15 - line 31 * [A] 1-5,15,16 |