EP1905796 - Biochemical instrument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kubo, Takashi Fujifilm Corporation 577-1, Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kangawa, 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
Nishimi, Taisei Fujifilm Corporation 577-1, Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kangawa, 258-8577 / JP | 03 /
Hoshi, Satoshi Fujifilm Corporation 577-1, Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kangawa, 258-8577 / JP | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07018939.4 | 26.09.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | JP20060267938 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006267938 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905796 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, G01N33/53, A61J1/00, A61M3/00 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
C08J7/0423 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/056 (EP,US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31721 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [2008/50] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Biochemisches Instrument | [2008/14] | English: | Biochemical instrument | [2008/14] | French: | Instrument biochimique | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 10.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 03.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH05132574 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-14 * abstract * [Y] 1-14; | [A]JPH06316025 (SHOWA DENKO KK, et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0989418 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PROD [US]) [Y] 1-14 * claims 1-10 *; | [X]US2006210425 (MIRKARIMI LAURA [US]) [X] 1-14* paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0006] - [0074]; claims 1-31 *; | [Y] - JACOB PIEHLER ET AL, "Surface modification for direct immunoprobes", BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS, (1996), vol. 11, no. 6/7, pages 579 - 590, XP002466758 [Y] 1-14 * page 779 - page 584 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0956-5663(96)83293-3 |