EP1916356 - Foot plate, levelling unit and duct [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OBO Bettermann GmbH & Co. KG Hüingser Ring 52 58710 Menden / DE | [2008/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beckmeyer, Karl-Heinz Oppelner Weg 9 58566 Kierspe / DE | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Kronenstrasse 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07019112.7 | 28.09.2007 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | DE20061050975 | 20.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006050975 | [2008/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1916356 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1916356 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/024, H02G3/18, H02G3/38 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
E04F15/02476 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fussplatte, Nivelliereinheit sowie Leitungskanal | [2008/18] | English: | Foot plate, levelling unit and duct | [2008/18] | French: | Plaque d'assise, unité de nivelage ainsi que caniveau | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4930277 (KRUMHOLZ FRANK C [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-9 * figure 4 * * column 4, line 15 - line 25 * * column 7, line 26 - line 31 * [Y] 5; | [Y]EP0567679 (HIROSS SPA [IT]) [Y] 5* column 2, line 22 - line 29; figures 1,4 *; | [X]DE102004037759 (BETTERMANN OBO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * paragraph [0052]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE202005017279U (HONEGGER & PAPARO E IN [CH]) [A] * figure 1 * |