EP1911673 - Method and device for de-icing the wall of an aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROCOPTER Aéroport International Marseille-Provence 13725 Marignane Cédex / FR | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boschet, Patrick 34 Rue Erik Satie 78180 Montigny le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
Lorcet, Bruno 8 Avenue des Cévennes 91940 Les Ulis / FR | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | GPI & Associés EuroParc de Pichaury Bâtiment B2 - 1er Etage 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière 13856 Aix-en-Provence Cedex 3 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | GPI & Associés 1330, rue Guillibert de la Lauzière EuroParc de Pichaury, Bât B2 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | ||
Former [2008/16] | Pouillot, Laurent Pierre Paul GPI & Associes EuroParc de Pichaury - Bat D1 1330 Rue Guillibert de la Lauzière 13856 Aix en Provence Cedex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07019327.1 | 02.10.2007 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | FR20060008824 | 09.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0608824 | [2008/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1911673 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1911673 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B64D15/12, H05B6/36 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
B64D15/12 (EP,US);
H05B6/02 (EP,US);
H05B6/105 (EP,US);
H05B6/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT [2008/52] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Enteisen einer Aussenhaut eines Luftschiffs | [2008/16] | English: | Method and device for de-icing the wall of an aircraft | [2008/16] | French: | Procèdé et dispositif de dégivrage d'une paroi d'aéronef | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 17.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2142785 (HANSON EARL C) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1012165 (THOMAS EDWARD EVANS) [A] 1-17 * page 2, line 129 - page 3, line 23 * * page 3, line 107 - page 4, line 4 ** figures 1-7 *; | [A]GB1306062 (EVANS T.E.) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0428142 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP0433763 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1-12 *; | [A]JPH10165311 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0052966 (DARTMOUTH COLLEGE [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * pages 1-6 * * figures 15-19 *; | [X]JP2001278195 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US6377775 (NAKAYAMA TOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 4a *; | [A]JP2005228571 (TOTOKU ELECTRIC) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | JP2001278195 | JP2005228571 |