EP1916441 - Torsion vibration damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/52] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states LuK Lamellen und Kupplungsbau Beteiligungs KG Industriestrasse 3 77815 Bühl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schumann, Lars Kappelwindeckstrasse 68a 77815 Bühl / DE | [2008/18] | Application number, filing date | 07019402.2 | 04.10.2007 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | DE20061050523 | 26.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006050523 | DE20071022540 | 14.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007022540 | DE20071022537 | 14.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007022537 | DE20071023276 | 18.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007023276 | [2008/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1916441 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1916441 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | [2009/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1916441 | Date: | 19.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/131, F16F15/139, F16D67/00 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
F16F15/13128 (EP);
F16D41/206 (EP);
F16F15/1343 (EP);
F16F15/1397 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | Torsionsschwingungsdämpfer | [2008/18] | English: | Torsion vibration damper | [2008/18] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations de torsion | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/23] | 20.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.01.2011 | CZ | 19.01.2011 | DK | 19.01.2011 | EE | 19.01.2011 | FI | 19.01.2011 | HU | 19.01.2011 | IE | 19.01.2011 | IT | 19.01.2011 | LT | 19.01.2011 | LV | 19.01.2011 | MT | 19.01.2011 | NL | 19.01.2011 | PL | 19.01.2011 | RO | 19.01.2011 | SE | 19.01.2011 | SI | 19.01.2011 | SK | 19.01.2011 | TR | 19.01.2011 | BG | 19.04.2011 | GR | 20.04.2011 | ES | 30.04.2011 | IS | 19.05.2011 | PT | 19.05.2011 | GB | 04.10.2011 | LU | 04.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
TR | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 04.10.2011 | ||
LU | 04.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 04.10.2011 | ||
LU | 04.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
MT | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 04.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
GB | 04.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
IT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
CZ | 19.01.2011 | ||
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
RO | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
SK | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
DK | 19.01.2011 | ||
EE | 19.01.2011 | ||
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
IE | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
NL | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 19.01.2011 | |
FI | 19.01.2011 | ||
LT | 19.01.2011 | ||
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
SI | 19.01.2011 | ||
BG | 19.04.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 19.01.2011 | |
LV | 19.01.2011 | ||
PL | 19.01.2011 | ||
SE | 19.01.2011 | ||
GR | 20.04.2011 | ||
ES | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 19.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19721236 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE19847764 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]US6119841 (ORLAMUENDER ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]DE10223815 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4117584 | DE19834728 |