EP1867354 - Device for removing protein-bound substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hepa Wash GmbH Boltzmannstrasse 11a 85748 Garching / DE | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreymann, Bernhard, Dr. Ohmstrasse 8 80802 München / DE | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstraße 22 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Bosch, Graf v. Stosch, Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07019460.0 | 12.05.2003 | [2007/51] | Priority number, date | EP20020010185 | 14.05.2002 Original published format: EP 02010185 | [2007/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1867354 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1867354 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1867354 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/34, A61M1/16 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
A61M1/1696 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3486 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/1676 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3472 (EP);
A61M1/3482 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3493 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | 04.10.2007 | LT | 04.10.2007 | LV | 04.10.2007 | MK | 04.10.2007 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Entfernung proteingebundener Substanzen | [2007/51] | English: | Device for removing protein-bound substances | [2007/51] | French: | Dispositif destiné à l'enlèvement de substances liées aux protéines | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 31.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03749886.2 / EP1534359 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030749886) is 13.09.2007 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2003 | CY | 29.08.2012 | CZ | 29.08.2012 | DK | 29.08.2012 | EE | 29.08.2012 | FI | 29.08.2012 | MC | 29.08.2012 | RO | 29.08.2012 | SI | 29.08.2012 | SK | 29.08.2012 | BG | 29.11.2012 | GR | 30.11.2012 | IE | 12.05.2013 | LU | 12.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/20] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
IE | 12.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
MC | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
BG | 29.11.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
RO | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SK | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
CZ | 29.08.2012 | ||
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
EE | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
DK | 29.08.2012 | ||
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
SI | 29.08.2012 | ||
GR | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 29.08.2012 | |
FI | 29.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 29.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8400689 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 6, paragraph 1; figures 12-14; claims 5,6 *; | [XY]US4663049 (KOLFF WILLEM J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,10-13 * figure .; claims 21,25,26 * [Y] 6,9; | [Y]FR2651438 (FONDATION NALE TRANSFUSION SAN [FR]) [Y] 6 * page 2, line 11 - line 20; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0615780 (STANGE JAN [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * page 11, line 20 - line 39; claim 19 *; | [XY]US6264680 (ASH STEPHEN R [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * abstract * * column 15, line 60 - column 16, line 4 * [Y] 9; | [X]US2002019603 (STRAHILEVITZ MEIR [US]) [X] 1-3,7* figure 1; claim - * |