EP1920800 - Snowboard or skateboard comprising different concentrations of fibers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SALOMON S.A.S. Les Croiselets 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [2009/35] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Salomon S.A. Lieudit "Les Croiselets" 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adamczewski, David 20, avenue de Novel 74000 Annecy / FR | 02 /
Rancon, Henri 4 quai Louis Lachenal 74000 Annecy / FR | [2008/20] | Application number, filing date | 07019600.1 | 08.10.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | FR20060009801 | 10.11.2006 Original published format: FR 0609801 | [2008/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1920800 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/12 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
A63C5/12 (EP);
A63C5/126 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [2009/04] |
Former [2008/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Snowboard oder Rollerboard mit unterschiedlichen Faserdichten | [2008/20] | English: | Snowboard or skateboard comprising different concentrations of fibers | [2008/20] | French: | Planche de glisse ou de roulage comprenant des concentrations de fibres différentes | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 15.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/18] | 21.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2366035 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,9,10,12 * figure 1 *; | [X]WO8100057 (HASEGAWA CHEM IND [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,10,12 * abstract *; | [X]FR2546413 (ROHRMOSER ALOIS SKIFABRIK [AT]) [X] 1-5,8-12 * page 4, lines 18-38; figures 12-16 *; | [X]FR2725910 (KAESTLE AG [AT]) [X] 1-8,10,12 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1693089 (ROSSIGNOL SA [FR]) [X] 1-4,7-10,12 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035]; figure 1 *; | [PX]FR2888126 (SKIS ROSSIGNOL SA SA [FR]) [PX] 1,3,4,10,12* figures 1-7 * |