EP1889587 - Intersomatic cage for posterior fusion surgery to the lumbar column and for surgery involving the insertion of a transforaminal implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biomet Spain Orthopaedics S.L. 46988 Poligno Fuente del Jarro Paterna (Valencia) / ES | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lopez Casquero, Carlos c/o Biomet Spain Orthopaedics S.L. 46988 Fuente del Jarro / ES | 02 /
Sierra Aparici, Alfredo c/o Biomet Spain Orthopaedics S.L. 46988 Fuente del Jarro / ES | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Koepe, Gerd L. Koepe & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Koepe, Gerd L. Koepe & Partner Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07019647.2 | 16.08.2002 | [2008/08] | Priority number, date | ES20010001905 | 16.08.2001 Original published format: ES 200101905 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1889587 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1889587 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
A61F2/4455 (EP,ES);
A61F2/446 (ES);
A61F2/4465 (ES);
A61F2/4611 (EP,ES);
A61F2/30965 (EP);
A61F2/447 (EP);
A61F2002/2835 (EP);
A61F2002/30133 (EP);
A61F2002/30308 (EP);
A61F2002/30538 (EP);
A61F2002/30579 (EP);
A61F2002/30593 (EP);
A61F2002/30774 (EP);
A61F2002/30777 (EP);
A61F2002/30785 (EP);
A61F2002/30789 (EP);
A61F2002/30891 (EP);
A61F2002/30904 (EP);
A61F2002/448 (EP);
A61F2002/4627 (EP);
A61F2230/0015 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2008/08] | Title | German: | Intersomatischer Cage für posteriore Fusionschirurgie an der Lendenwirbelsäule und für chirurgische Verfahren mit dem Einsatz eines transforaminalen Implantats | [2008/08] | English: | Intersomatic cage for posterior fusion surgery to the lumbar column and for surgery involving the insertion of a transforaminal implant | [2008/08] | French: | Cage intersomatique pour chirurgie de fusion postérieure de la colonne lombaire pour chirurgie impliquant l'insertion d'un implant transforaminal | [2008/08] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/15] | 22.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02018509.6 / EP1290985 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020018509) is 07.11.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2010 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2010 | 31.08.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4834757 (BRANTIGAN JOHN W [US]); | [A]DE4318700 (S & G IMPLANTS GMBH [DE]); | [X]FR2736537 (VILA THIERRY [FR]); | [XA]WO9937255 (FUSS FRANZ KONSTANTIN [AT], et al); | [A]WO9938461 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al); | [XA]WO0044317 (AESCULAP AG & CO KG [DE], et al); | [XA]WO0128469 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | FR2736537 | WO9937255 | WO0044317 | WO0128469 | EP1290985 |