EP2048901 - Method and device for selecting a scrambling code and communication system comprising such device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breuer, Volker, Dr. Schwalbenring 20 16727 Bötzow / DE | 02 /
Vesely, Alexander Raabau 119 8330 Feldbach / AT | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60 81617 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60 81617 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07019649.8 | 08.10.2007 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2048901 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/00 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
H04W24/06 (EP);
H04J11/0069 (EP);
H04W84/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/52] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Auswahl eines Verwürfelungskodes und Kommunikationssystem mit einer derartigen Vorrichtung | [2009/16] | English: | Method and device for selecting a scrambling code and communication system comprising such device | [2009/16] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de sélection d'un code de brouillage et système de communication comprenant un tel dispositif | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/15] | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007097939 (NYLANDER TOMAS [SE], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0060] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0078] * * figures 1A-1E,4 *; | [X]US2007232313 (HOSONO HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0007] - [0011] * * paragraphs [0045] - [0047] * * paragraphs [0054] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0077] * * paragraphs [0104] - [0106] ** figures 1,4 * |