EP2047982 - Flat fire protection material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CURESYS AG Klosterstrasse 42 5430 Wettingen / CH | [2009/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dätwiler, Urs Im Rüteli 7 5405 Dättwil / CH | 02 /
Fritschi, Markus Landstrasse 14 5415 Rieden b. Nussbaumen / CH | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07019780.1 | 10.10.2007 | [2009/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2047982 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/14, B32B17/04, E04B1/94, A62C2/06 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
B32B15/14 (EP);
B32B15/20 (EP);
B32B17/02 (EP);
B32B5/022 (EP);
B32B5/26 (EP);
E04B1/94 (EP);
A62C2/06 (EP);
A62C8/06 (EP);
B32B2262/0269 (EP);
B32B2262/101 (EP);
B32B2262/106 (EP);
B32B2307/416 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Title | German: | Flächiges Brandschutzmaterial | [2009/16] | English: | Flat fire protection material | [2009/16] | French: | Matériau pare-feu plat | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4502153 (LAPEDES RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * figures 2,3; claims 1,2,14,22 *; | [X]EP0626183 (TOKYO NISSHIN JABARA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6,7 * column 4, lines 30-40; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US5464952 (SHAH HITEN T [US], et al) [X] 1,6* column 3, lines 25-36; claims 1,5,7 *; | [X]US5486408 (SENTENDREY JOSEPH S [US]) [X] 1,6 * figure 4; example 2; claims 1,5,6,8 *; | [X]US2002160673 (ZUPON LAWRENCE [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * figure 1B; claims 1-3,8-11,14 * |