EP1912407 - Method for encrypted communication with a computer system and system therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Yoko c/o Hitachi Ltd Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Fujishiro, Takahiro c/o Hitachi Ltd Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Kaji, Tadashi c/o Hitachi Ltd Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Takata, Osamu c/o Hitachi Ltd Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Hoshino, Kazuyoshi c/o Hitachi Ltd Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07019839.5 | 10.10.2007 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | JP20060275944 | 10.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006275944 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912407 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F21/00 (KR);
G06F9/00 (KR);
H04L63/0272 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/0869 (EP,US);
H04L67/1001 (EP,US);
H04L67/1006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/52] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur verschlüsselten Kommunikation mit einem Computersystem und System dafür | [2008/16] | English: | Method for encrypted communication with a computer system and system therefor | [2008/16] | French: | Procédé pour la communication cryptée avec un système informatique et système correspondant | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 17.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001049740 (KARPOFF WAYNE T [CA]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0099] , [0115] - [0117] - [0120] , [0124]; figures 7,14-16 *; | [X]US2003056063 (HOCHMUTH ROLAND M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0027] , [0035] , [0040] , [0041]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2003110259 (CHAPMAN DIANA M [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0018] , [0021] , [0027] - [0029]; figures 2,3 *; | [DA]WO2005101205 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al)[DA] 1-10; | [PA]US2007220120 (TSUNEHIRO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [PA] 1-10 * paragraphs [0005] , [0048] , [0092]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US2001049740 | US2003056063 | US2003110259 |