EP2060584 - Method for the production of proteins with chemically functionalized N-termini [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstraße 8 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Budisa, Nediljko Emeranstrasse 21 85622 Feldkirchen / DE | 02 /
Merkel, Lars Welfenstrasse 35 81541 München / DE | 03 /
Cheburkin, Yuri Agnesstrasse 10 80798 München / DE | 04 /
Ullrich, Axel Brunnstrasse 5 80331 München / DE | 05 /
Knyazev, Piotr Baiernplatz 1 82131 Stockdorf / DE | 06 /
Wiltschi, Birgit Schwalbensstrasse 100 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020231.2 | 16.10.2007 | [2009/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060584 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/485, C07K1/107, C12P1/04 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/485 (EP);
C12P21/005 (EP);
C12P21/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2010/04] |
Former [2009/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Proteinen mit chemisch funktionalisierten N-Termini | [2009/21] | English: | Method for the production of proteins with chemically functionalized N-termini | [2009/21] | French: | Procédé pour la production de protéines dotées de n-terminaisons à fonction chimique | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2007130453 (ALLOZYNE INC [US], et al) [E] 1-14,17-24,28-31 * page 77; examples 14,21; claim 1 *; | [X]US2006216760 (DIETERICH DANIELA C [US], et al) [X] 1-12,17-23,29-31 * paragraph [0172]; example 6 *; | [XD] - VAN HEST, JAN C. M.; KIICK, KRISTI L.; TIRRELL, DAVID A., "Efficient incorporation of unsaturated methionine analogues into proteins in vivo", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2000), vol. 122, no. 7, pages 1282 - 1288, XP002475309 [XD] 1-12,17-23,29-31 * CHART 1; pages 1285-86 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja992749j | [XDY] - KIICK, KRISTI L.; VAN HEST, JAN C. M.; TIRRELL, DAVID A., "Expanding the scope of protein biosynthesis by altering the methionyl-tRNA synthetase activity of a bacterial expression host", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (2000), vol. 39, no. 12, pages 2148 - 2152, XP002475310 [XD] 1-12,17-23,29-31 * page 2150, column LEFT, paragraph LAST * [Y] 15,16 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3773(20000616)39:12<2148::AID-ANIE2148>3.0.CO;2-7 | [Y] - LIAO Y-D ET AL, "REMOVAL OF N-TERMINAL METHIONINE FROM RECOMBINANT PROTEINS BY ENGINEERED E. COLI METHIONINE AMINOPEPTIDASE", PROTEIN SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (200407), vol. 13, no. 7, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 1802 - 1810, XP008043171 [Y] 15,16 * page 1807, column RIGHT, paragraph 2; table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1110/ps.04679104 | [A] - LINK A JAMES ET AL, "Non-canonical amino acids in protein engineering", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (200312), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 0958-1669, pages 603 - 609, XP002450437 [A] 1-31 * page 605 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2003.10.011 |