EP1921722 - Switching cabinet for an electrical installation distribution system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AG Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states ABB AG Kallstadter Str. 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lott, Günther Am Waldhag 16 77839 Lichtenau / DE | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Miller, Toivo ABB Patent GmbH, Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020784.0 | 24.10.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | DE20061053358 | 10.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006053358 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1921722 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1921722 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/30 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
H02B1/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | Schaltschrank für eine elektrische Installationsverteilung | [2008/20] | English: | Switching cabinet for an electrical installation distribution system | [2008/20] | French: | Armoire électrique pour distribution électrique | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2007 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | ES | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | IT | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | MT | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.10.2007 | |
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
TR | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5584406 (BESSERER HORST [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 3, lines 3-15 * * column 4, lines 1-10; figure - *; | [X]US2003146011 (THIELMANN BODO [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0021]; figure - *; | [A]DE20315619U (TSAI CHIANG HAI [TW]) [A] 2-13* paragraph [0010]; figure - *; | [X]EP1583192 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011]; figure - * | by applicant | US5584406 | US2003146011 | EP1583192 |