EP1906292 - Shaft for a motor or for a gear box with collarless circularly magnetized torque transducer, corresponding torque measuring method and corresponding producing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/14] | Collarless circularly magnetized torque transducer and method for measuring torque using same | ||
[2009/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna-Lastic Devices, Inc. 111 West Buchanan Street Carthage, IL 62321-0130 / US | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garshelis, Ivan J. 176 South Mountain Road Pittsfield, MA 01201 / US | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/14] | Degwert, Hartmut Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020789.9 | 21.10.1998 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | US19970064831P | 21.10.1997 Original published format: US 64831 P | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1906292 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1906292 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05D17/00, G01L3/10 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
G01L3/102 (EP,US);
G01L3/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/14] | Title | German: | Antriebs- oder Getriebewelle mit einem manschettenlosen Drehmomentsensor mit kreisförmiger Magnetisierung, dazugehöriges Mess- und Herstellungsverfahren | [2009/35] | English: | Shaft for a motor or for a gear box with collarless circularly magnetized torque transducer, corresponding torque measuring method and corresponding producing method | [2009/35] | French: | Arbre pour moteur ou pour boîte de vitesse muni d'un transducteur de couple magnétisé circulairement sans collerette, procédés correspondants de mesure de couple et de fabrication | [2009/35] |
Former [2008/14] | Manschettenloser Drehmomentsensor mit kreisförmiger Magnetisierung und dazugehöriges Messverfahren | ||
Former [2008/14] | Collarless circularly magnetized torque transducer and method for measuring torque using same | ||
Former [2008/14] | Transducteur à couple magnétisé circulairement sans collerette et procédé pour mesurer le couple l'utilisant | Examination procedure | 24.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 13.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98950604.3 / EP0953169 | Divisional application(s) | EP10005368.5 / EP2216702 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.2010 | BE | 23.06.2010 | CY | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | FI | 23.06.2010 | NL | 23.06.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | IE | 21.10.2010 | LU | 21.10.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IE | 21.10.2010 | ||
LU | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IE | 21.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4896544 (GARSHELIS IVAN J [US]) [A] 1,4,7,10,13* column 10, line 3 - column 17, line 55 *; | [A]US5465627 (GARSHELIS IVAN J [US]) [A] 1,4,7,10,13 * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 18 *; | [A]US5520059 (GARSHELIS IVAN J [US]) [A] 1,4,7,10,13 * column 6, line 18 - column 7, line 21; figure 1 * * column 11, line 29 - line 52 * |