EP2052609 - Herbicide combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hacker, Erwin, Dr. Margarethenstrasse 16 65239 Hochheim / DE | 02 /
Waldraff, Christian, Dr. Franz-Lehar-Weg 7 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | 03 /
Schreiber, Dominique Holbeinstrasse 37/04 60596 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
Hills, Martin Am Itzelgrund 5b 65510 Idstein / DE | 05 /
Feucht, Dieter, Dr. Am Burggraben 7A 65760 Eschborn / DE | 06 /
Müller, Klaus-Helmut, Dr. Solfstrasse 19 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 07 /
Gesing, R. F. Ernst, Dr. Trillser Graben 4 40699 Erkrath-Hochdahl / DE | 08 /
Bonfig-Picard, Georg, Dr. Landwehr 29 63517 Rodenbach / DE | [2009/18] | Application number, filing date | 07020852.5 | 24.10.2007 | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052609 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/36, A01N47/34, A01N47/32, A01N47/30, A01N47/28, A01P13/02 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
A01N47/36 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/36, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/36, A01N47/28, A01N47/30, A01N47/32, A01N47/34 (EP);
A01N47/36, A01N47/28, A01N47/30, A01N47/32, A01N47/34, A01N47/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/01] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herbizid-Kombination | [2009/18] | English: | Herbicide combination | [2009/18] | French: | Combinaison d'herbicide | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/20] | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/20] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US4127405 (LEVITT GEORGE) [DY] 1-8 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 32 * * column 8, line 63 * * column 24, lines 33-35,51,52. *; | [Y]DE4241629 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * page 2, lines 14-60 * * page 6, lines 24-30 ** page 8, lines 36-45 *; | [Y]WO9641537 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 20 * * page 8, lines 11-14 * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 4 * * table 3 *; | [Y]WO9710714 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, line 40 - page 5, line 29 * * page 7, lines 25-31 *; | [Y]WO2006114220 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 21 - page 3, line 25 * * Tabelle 1: Verbindungen 1.016,1.017. * * page 35, line 17 - page 37, line 14 * | by applicant | US2655445 | US2655444 | DE1028986 | GB914779 | DE1210793 | US3309192 | GB1085430 | US3434822 | DE1905598 | GB1165160 | DE2101938 | GB1266172 | DE1793602 | GB1407587 | DE2506690 | BE853374 | DE2715786 | US4127405 | US4169719 | US4193788 | EP0048436 | EP0084020 | US4400196 | EP0086750 | EP0094349 | EP0131624 | JPS6087254 | EP0142924 | JPS60172919 | EP0174562 | EP0191736 | EP0193259 | US4629494 | EP0221044 | EP0257993 | EP0269806 | EP0333131 | EP0336151 | EP0346620 | EP0365484 | US5013659 | WO9107874 | WO9108202 | WO9113972 | WO9119806 | US5098466 | EP0476555 | DE4038430 | WO9209608 | EP0492366 | WO9211376 | WO9213845 | WO9214827 | EP0502014 | EP0582198 | WO9406778 | WO9507897 | JPH07242493 | JPH07335454 | WO9745016 | WO9813361 | WO9827049 | WO9838856 | WO9900020 | WO9916744 | WO0234048 | WO02072560 | WO2004084631 | WO2005015994 | WO2005016001 | WO2005112630 | WO2006007981 | WO2007023719 | WO2007023764 | - WEED RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 26, pages 441 - 445 | - CHRISTOU, Trends in Plant Science, (1996), vol. 1, pages 423 - 431 | - BRAUN ET AL., EMBO J., (1992), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 3219 - 3227 | - WOLTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SEI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 846 - 850 | - SONNEWALD ET AL., PLANT J., (1991), vol. 1, pages 95 - 106 | - "Factors Affecting Herbicidal Activity and Selectivity", PROC. EWRS SYMP., (1988), pages 227 - 232 | - Römpp Chemie Lexikon, THIEME VERLAG, vol. 2, page 1343 |