EP2052612 - Herbicide combination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hacker, Erwin, Dr. Margarethenstrasse 16 65239 Hochheim / DE | 02 /
Waldraff, Christian, Dr. Franz-Lehar-Weg 7 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE | 03 /
Schreiber, Dominique Holbeinstrasse 37/04 60596 Frankfurt / DE | 04 /
Hills, Martin Am Itzelgrund 5b 65510 Idstein / DE | 05 /
Feucht, Dieter, Dr. Am Burggraben 7A 65760 Eschborn / DE | 06 /
Müller, Klaus-Helmut, Dr. Solfstrasse 19 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 07 /
Gesing, R. F. Ernst, Dr. Trillser Graben 4 40699 Erkrath-Hochdahl / DE | 08 /
Bonfig-Picard, Georg, Dr. Landwehr 29 63517 Rodenbach / DE | [2009/18] | Application number, filing date | 07020855.8 | 24.10.2007 | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052612 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/36, A01N47/06, A01N43/90, A01N43/88, A01N43/86, A01N43/84, A01N43/80, A01N43/78, A01N43/56, A01N43/40, A01N43/12, A01N43/08, A01N39/04, A01N37/46, A01N33/18, A01P13/02, // A01N61/02, A01N59/16, A01N59/02, A01N59/00, A01N55/02, A01N47/28, A01N37/06, A01N37/02 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
A01N47/36 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N47/36, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N47/36, A01N33/18, A01N37/46, A01N39/04, A01N43/08, A01N43/12, A01N43/40, A01N43/56, A01N43/78, A01N43/80, A01N43/84, A01N43/86, A01N43/88, A01N43/90, A01N47/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/01] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herbizid-Kombination | [2009/18] | English: | Herbicide combination | [2009/18] | French: | Combinaison d'herbicide | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/19] | 07.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US4127405 (LEVITT GEORGE) [DY] 1-8 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 32 * * column 8, line 63 * * column 24, lines 33-56 *; | [Y]US5498773 (NOVEROSKE ROBERT L [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 2, lines 18-28,56 ** column 3, lines 9-25 *; | [Y]WO9641537 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 20 * * page 11, lines 1-5,14-17 * * page 21, lines 6-14 *; | [Y]WO9710714 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, line 40 - page 5, line 29 * * page 6, lines 13-19 * * page 7, lines 1-24 * * page 8, lines 18-30 * * page 9, lines 16-20 * * page 16, lines 27,36 *; | [Y]WO03015520 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 4 * * page 6, paragraph 2; examples 2,3 *; | [Y]WO03015514 (FALCON LAB LLC [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 5,6 * * page 7, paragraph 1 * * table I * * page 7, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]WO2006114220 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, line 21 - page 3, line 25 * * Tabelle 1: Verbindungen 1.016, 1.017 * * page 35, line 17 - page 37, line 14 * | by applicant | GB1051652 | US2042220 | US2131259 | US2192197 | US2277744 | US2393086 | US2550494 | US2575954 | US2615801 | US2642354 | US2678265 | US2766554 | US2823987 | GB813531 | US2923634 | GB862226 | DE1105232 | US2998310 | US3041279 | US3056668 | US3113908 | US3156554 | US3240799 | US3257190 | US3367949 | DE1926139 | US3506434 | DE1768447 | DE2013509 | DE1542836 | DE1695840 | US3617252 | US3672866 | DE2241408 | DE2165651 | DE2207575 | DE2361464 | US3856814 | DE2331398 | US3882142 | US3920438 | DE2537753 | DE2612731 | DE2650434 | BE853374 | DE2715786 | DE2803991 | US4127405 | US4169719 | DE3121704 | EP0048436 | EP0081893 | EP0083055 | EP0084020 | US4397675 | US4400196 | EP0086750 | EP0094349 | DE3422346 | EP0131624 | EP0133612 | JPS6087254 | EP0142924 | EP0170191 | EP0174562 | EP0191736 | EP0193259 | US4629494 | WO8702357 | EP0221044 | WO8705897 | EP0240659 | EP0257993 | EP0269806 | EP0278944 | EP0333131 | EP0336151 | EP0346620 | EP0359438 | EP0363236 | EP0365484 | EP0398258 | US5013659 | WO9107874 | WO9108202 | US5037654 | WO9113972 | WO9119806 | EP0476555 | DE4038430 | WO9209608 | EP0492366 | WO9211376 | WO9213845 | WO9214827 | EP0502014 | WO9307746 | WO9315064 | EP0582198 | WO9406778 | JPH0625144B | WO9507897 | WO9707104 | WO9745016 | WO9813361 | WO9827049 | WO9838856 | WO9900020 | WO9916744 | WO0151468 | US6271176 | WO0234048 | WO02072560 | WO2004084631 | WO2005015994 | WO2005016001 | WO2005112630 | WO2006007981 | WO2007023719 | WO2007023764 | - WEED RESEARCH, (1986), vol. 26, pages 441 - 445 | - "Christou", TRENDS IN PLANT SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 1, pages 423 - 431 | - BRAUN ET AL., EMBO J., (1992), vol. 11, pages 3219 - 3227 | - WOLTER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1988), vol. 85, pages 846 - 850 | - SONNEWALD ET AL., PLANT J, (1991), vol. 1, pages 95 - 106 | - "Factors Affecting Herbicidal Activity and Selectivity", SOWIE PROC. EWRS SYMP, (1988), pages 227 - 232 | - Römpp Chemie Lexikon, THIEME VERLAG STUTTGART, vol. 2, page 1343 |