EP1927541 - Bicycle gear shifter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takebayashi, Haruyuki 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Kazuhiro 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2011/50] |
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
Takebayashi, Haruyuki 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
Fujii, Kazuhiro 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [2011/50] |
Former [2008/23] | Hofmann, Harald, et al 24IP Law Group Sonnenberg Fortmann Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020885.5 | 25.10.2007 | [2008/23] | Priority number, date | JP20060322077 | 29.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006322077 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1927541 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1927541 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927541 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/08, B62K23/06 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
B62M25/08 (EP,US);
B62K23/06 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2009/44] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrradgangschalthebel | [2008/23] | English: | Bicycle gear shifter | [2008/23] | French: | Sélecteur de vitesses de bicyclette | [2008/23] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 26.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.10.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11186922.8 / EP2431272 | EP13170369.6 / EP2636585 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4041788 (NININGER JR NATHAN VIVIEN) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]US4850939 (CHILCOTE KEITH C [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 17, line 11 - line 17 *; | [A]EP0834685 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 2,10,12,13 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 6 * * column 18, line 12 - line 21 *; | [A]EP1245483 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 2 * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]EP1473221 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [A] 5* paragraph [0007]; figure 22; claim 38 *; | [YA]EP1568597 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [Y] 5-7,10 * column 4, line 4 - line 5; figure 13 * [A] 12,13; | [XY]US2006116227 (MERCAT JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,8,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 5-7,10; | [X]EP1705110 (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0056] , [0062] * | by applicant | JP2002267002 | US2006116227 |