EP1977828 - Catalyst carrier and exhaust-gas treating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ibiden Co., Ltd. 1 Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8604 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states IBIDEN CO., LTD. 1 Kandacho 2-chome Ogaki-shi Gifu 503-8604 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ido, Takahiko c/o Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogakikita Kojo 1-1 Kitagata Ibigawa-cho Ibi-Gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | 02 /
Ohno, Kazushige c/o Ibiden Co., Ltd. Ogakikita Kojo 1-1 Kitagata Ibigawa-cho Ibi-Gun Gifu 501-0695 / JP | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020896.2 | 25.10.2007 | [2008/41] | Priority number, date | WO2007JP57253 | 30.03.2007 Original published format: PCT/JP2007/057253 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977828 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01D46/24, B28B23/12, F01N3/022, F01N3/28 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B28B19/0038 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
C04B35/18 (EP,US);
C04B35/6316 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B37/005 (EP,US);
C04B38/0006 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5031 (EP,US);
C04B41/87 (EP,US);
F01N3/2828 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C04B2111/0081 (EP,US);
C04B2235/322 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3463 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5228 (EP,US);
C04B2235/526 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5264 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5276 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2237/062 (EP,US);
C04B2237/064 (EP,US);
C04B2237/341 (EP,US);
C04B2237/343 (EP,US);
F01N2330/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B35/803, C04B38/0006, C04B35/18, C04B38/0009, C04B38/0016, C04B38/0054, C04B38/0074 (EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/10 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/185 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B38/0006 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | Katalysatorträger und Abgasreinigungsvorrichtung | [2008/41] | English: | Catalyst carrier and exhaust-gas treating device | [2008/41] | French: | Support de catalyseur et dispositif de traitement des gaz d'échappement | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 22.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4203949 (HAYASHI TADAYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 55 - line 62 * * column 4, line 64 - column 6, line 28 * * figures 4-6 * [Y] 1-12; | [XY]US4432943 (MUSALL REIMAR [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 2, line 44 - page 3, line 8 * * figure 1 * * claims 1,4,5 * [Y] 1-12; | [A]JPH0780226 (IBIDEN CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US5855781 (YORITA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * column 5, line 39 - line 60 *; | [A]EP1736223 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,7-10 * paragraph [0062] * * claim - ** figure - * | by applicant | US4203949 | US4432943 | JP2005218935 | JP2005349378 |