EP2053764 - Method and device for transmitter calibration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mellein, Heinz A. Kaspersauer-Strasse 36 85540 Haar / DE | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Körfer, Thomas, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07020946.5 | 25.10.2007 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2053764 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2053764 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
H04B17/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/01] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Senderkalibrierung | [2009/18] | English: | Method and device for transmitter calibration | [2009/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'étalonnage d'un transmetteur | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 30.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CA2581321 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** page 7, line 17 - page 9, line 26; figure 2 *; | [AD]US2006240815 (SHIM BO-WOOK [KR], et al) [AD] 1,10 * abstract *; | [X] - MAHMOUD, H.A. ARSLAN, H. OZDEMIR, M.K., "Initial Ranging for WiMAX (802.16e) OFDMA", MILITARY COMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE MILCOM, (20061023), pages 1 - 7, XP002492486 [X] 1,12 * Introduction * | [X] - PING LONG ET AL, "Ranging Schemes in HFC Networks and its Embedded Implementation", SYSTEMS AND CONTROL IN AEROSPACE AND ASTRONAUTICS, 2006. ISSCAA 2006. 1ST INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON HARBIN, CHINA 19-21 JAN. 2006, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20060119), ISBN 978-0-7803-9395-0, pages 1061 - 1064, XP010913996 [X] 1,12 * 1. Introduction * * 2. Docsis Ranging Schemes Analysis * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSCAA.2006.1627551 |