EP1900527 - Intermediate transfer medium coating solution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/12] | Intermediate transfer medium coating solution and method of ink jet printing coating solution | ||
[2009/03] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. 740 West New Circle Road Lexington, Kentucky 40550 / US | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beach, Bradley Leonard 1757 Hawthorne Lane Lexington, KY 40505 / US | 02 /
Massie, Jean Marie 3533 Castlegate Wynd Lexington, KY 40502 / US | 03 /
Roe, Ronald Lloyd 612 Portland Drive Lexington, KY 40503 / US | 04 /
Macmillan, David Starling 112 Hampton Avenue Winchester, KY 40391 / US | [2008/30] |
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
Beach, Bradley Leonard 1757 Hawthorne Lane Lexington, KY 40505 / US | ||
02 /
Massie, Jean Marie 583 Gingermill Lane Lexington, KY 40509 / US | |||
03 /
Roe, Ronald Lloyd 932 Woodglen Court Lexington, KY 40515 / US | |||
04 /
Macmillan, David Starling 240 Buffalo Trace Winchester, KY 40391 / US | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07021599.1 | 10.10.2001 | [2008/12] | Priority number, date | US20000686130 | 10.10.2000 Original published format: US 686130 | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900527 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/005 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
B41J2/0057 (EP,US);
B41J2/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/12] | Title | German: | Beschichtungslösung für ein Zwischenübertragungsmedium | [2009/03] | English: | Intermediate transfer medium coating solution | [2009/03] | French: | Solution de revêtement de support de transfert intermédiaire | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/12] | Beschichtungslösung für ein Zwischenübertragungsmittel und Verfahren für eine Tintenstrahldruck-Beschichtungslösung | ||
Former [2008/12] | Intermediate transfer medium coating solution and method of ink jet printing coating solution | ||
Former [2008/12] | Solution de revêtement de support de transfert intermédiaire et procédé de solution de revêtement d'impression à jet d'encre | Examination procedure | 11.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 04.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01979673.9 / EP1330357 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0540757 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * examples 2,3,6,7 *; | [A]US5700317 (ADAMIC RAYMOND J [US]) [A] 1-14* tables 11,12,14 *; | [A]EP0876914 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |