EP1912132 - Systems and methods for managing information relating to medical fluids and containers therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MALLINCKRODT, INC. 675 McDonnell Boulevard Hazelwood, MO 63042 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fago, Frank M. 4508 Estate Court Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 02 /
Wilson, David W. 1297 Sandwood Drive Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | 03 /
Gibson, Chad M. 3854 Elter Lane Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | 04 /
Bausmith, William E. 104 Marian Lane Terrace Park, Ohio 45174 / US | 05 /
Ortenzi, Vernon D. 4007 Princeton Drive Burlington, Kentucky 41005 / US | 06 /
Haynes, Elaine E. 3610 Utah Place St. Louis, Missouri 63116 / US | 07 /
Borgemenke, Elaine 5890 Chancellor Lane Morrow, Ohio 45152 / US | 08 /
Lewis, John H. 519 Lake Front Drive Lebanon, Ohio 45036 / US | 09 /
Wagner, Gary S. 2113 Patriot Way Independence, Kentucky 41051 / US | [2011/23] |
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
Fago, Frank M. 4508 Estate Court Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | ||
02 /
Wilson, David W. 1297 Sandwood Drive Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | |||
03 /
Gibson, Chad M. 3854 Elter Lane Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | |||
04 /
Bausmith, William E. 104 Marian Lane Terrace Park, Ohio 45174 / US | |||
05 /
Ortenzi, Vernon D. 4007 Princeton Drive Burlington, Kentucky 41005 / US | |||
06 /
Haynes, Elaine E. 3610 Utah Place St. Louis, Missouri 63116 / US | |||
07 /
Borgemenke, Elaine 5890 Chancellor Lane Morrow, Ohio 45036 / US | |||
08 /
Lewis, John H. 519 Lake Front Drive Lebanon, Ohio 45036 / US | |||
09 /
Wagner, Gary S. 2113 Patriot Way Independence, Kentucky 41051 / US | |||
Former [2008/16] | 01 /
Fago, Frank M. 4508 Estate Court Mason, Ohio 45040 / US | ||
02 /
Wilson, David W. 1297 Sandwood Drive Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US | |||
03 /
Gibson, Chad M. 1533 Northview Avenue Cincinnati, Ohio 45223 / US | |||
04 /
Bausmith, William E. 2069 Fawn Lane Batavia, Ohio 45103 / US | |||
05 /
Ortenzi, Vernon D. 4007 Princeton Drive Burlington, Kentucky 41005 / US | |||
06 /
Haynes, Elaine E. 3610 Utah Place St. Louis, Missouri 63116 / US | |||
07 /
Borgemenke, Elaine 5890 Chancellor Lane Morrow, Ohio 45036 / US | |||
08 /
Lewis, John H. 519 Lake Front Drive Lebanon, Ohio 45036 / US | |||
09 /
Wagner, Gary S. 2113 Patriot Way Independence, Kentucky 41051 / US | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07021633.8 | 04.04.2006 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | US20050668647P | 06.04.2005 Original published format: US 668647 P | US20050668681P | 06.04.2005 Original published format: US 668681 P | US20050681252P | 16.05.2005 Original published format: US 681252 P | US20050716166P | 12.09.2005 Original published format: US 716166 P | US20050718545P | 19.09.2005 Original published format: US 718545 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912132 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1912132 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, A61M5/178 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
A61M5/007 (EP,BR,US);
G06Q50/22 (BR);
A61B90/98 (EP,BR,US);
A61M5/14546 (EP,BR,US);
A61M5/1785 (EP,BR,US);
A61M5/31511 (EP,BR,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,BR,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,BR,US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61M2005/14553 (EP,BR,US);
A61M2205/17 (EP,BR,US);
A61M2205/3569 (EP,BR,US);
A61M2205/60 (EP,BR,US);
A61M2205/6054 (EP,BR,US);
A61M5/002 (EP,BR,US);
A61M5/1456 (EP,BR,US);
A61M5/14566 (EP,BR,US);
A61M5/16827 (EP,BR,US);
A61M5/3129 (EP);
A61M5/44 (EP,BR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Verwaltung von Informationen bezüglich medizinischer Flüssigkeiten und Behälter dafür | [2008/16] | English: | Systems and methods for managing information relating to medical fluids and containers therefor | [2008/16] | French: | Systèmes et procédés pour la gestion d'informations relatives à des fluides médicaux et récipients correspondants | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 26.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.10.2010 | 13.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06740533.2 / EP1880330 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060740533) is 07.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2006 | AT | 08.06.2011 | BE | 08.06.2011 | CY | 08.06.2011 | CZ | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | EE | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | LT | 08.06.2011 | LV | 08.06.2011 | PL | 08.06.2011 | RO | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | SI | 08.06.2011 | SK | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | BG | 08.09.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | IS | 08.10.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
IS | 08.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
LV | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
LT | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 08.06.2011 | |
SE | 08.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5274239 (LANE STEPHEN M [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5920054 (UBER III ARTHUR E [US]) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 16 *; | [A]WO03026724 (GAMBRO INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US2004193449 (WILDMAN TIMOTHY D [US], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [Y]US2004199075 (EVANS RUSSELL MORRISON [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2004220824 (IMAI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * paragraphs [0020] - [0023] * |