EP1995700 - Burglarproof device and method for electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACER INCORPORATED 8F, 88, Sec. 1, Hsin Tai Wu Road, Hsichih Taipei Hsien 221 / TW | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Su, Dong-Hsing 8F, No. 88, Sec. 1, Hsin Tai Wu Rd. Hsichih Taipei Hsien Taiwan / TW | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07021662.7 | 07.11.2007 | [2008/48] | Priority number, date | CN20071104169 | 21.05.2007 Original published format: CN200710104169 | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1995700 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1995700 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/14 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
G08B13/1409 (EP);
G06F21/88 (EP);
G08B13/1427 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Title | German: | Einbruchsichere Vorrichtung und Verfahren für eine elektronische Vorrichtung | [2008/48] | English: | Burglarproof device and method for electronic device | [2008/48] | French: | Dispositif incrochetable et procédé de dispositif électronique | [2008/48] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 02.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9738364 (EDIS S A [GR], et al); | [XY]GB2382441 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB]) |