EP2058098 - Method for manufacturing a wooden material and wooden material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kerle, Thomas Plauener Strasse 4 90765 Fürth / DE | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Stammler, Wolfgang Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Stammler, Wolfgang Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07021778.1 | 09.11.2007 | [2009/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2058098 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B27N3/00, C09J133/00 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
B27N3/002 (EP);
C09J133/08 (EP);
C08L2666/26 (EP);
C08L97/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09J133/08, C08L2666/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/03] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Holzwerkstoffes sowie Holzwerkstoff | [2009/20] | English: | Method for manufacturing a wooden material and wooden material | [2009/20] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un matériau dérivé du bois, ainsi que matériau dérivé du bois | [2009/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/20] | 23.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2005052084 (DYNEA ERKNER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-25* the whole document * |