EP1920954 - Method for regulating a motor vehicle air-conditioning system with at least two evaporators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | |||
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | |||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pitz, Eric Adlerstrasse 12 70199 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Lochmahr, Karl Mohnweg 5 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 03 /
Kemle, Andreas Edmund-Mansbart-Strasse 7 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 04 /
Baruschke, Wilhelm Rechbergweg 5 73117 Wangen / DE | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Wartbergstrasse 14 70191 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Grauel, Andreas Grauel IP Patentanwaltskanzlei Presselstrasse 10 70191 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/40] | Bendel, Christian, et al European Patent Attorney Hermann-Harry-Schmitz-Straße 22 40227 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Bendel, Christian, et al Haifastrasse 20 40227 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07021979.5 | 13.11.2007 | [2008/20] | Priority number, date | DE20061053674 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006053674 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1920954 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1920954 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00, B60H1/32, F24F11/00, F25B49/02, G05D7/06, F25B5/02 | [2012/31] | CPC: |
B60H1/323 (EP,US);
B60H1/00885 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B5/02 (EP);
B60H2001/3285 (EP);
F25B2309/061 (EP);
F25B2600/2513 (EP);
F25B2700/1931 (EP);
F25B2700/21152 (EP);
F25B2700/21172 (EP);
F25B2700/21173 (EP);
F25B40/00 (EP);
F25B9/008 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/20] | B60H1/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regelung einer Kraftfahrzeug-Klimaanlage mit mindestens zwei Verdampfern | [2008/20] | English: | Method for regulating a motor vehicle air-conditioning system with at least two evaporators | [2008/20] | French: | Procédé de régulation d'une installation de climatisation de véhicule automobile dotée d'au moins deux évaporateurs | [2008/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 11.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2007 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | LV | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | MT | 20.03.2013 | NL | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | ES | 01.07.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | AT | 13.11.2013 | IE | 13.11.2013 | LU | 13.11.2013 | BE | 30.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.11.2007 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/42] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4483151 (FUJIOKA KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4-6 * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 36; figures 1,9 *; | [XAY]US6126080 (WADA KEIJI [JP]) [X] 7,10 * column 2, line 27 - column 12, line 7; figures 1,2,8 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 1,4-6,8,9; | [Y]EP1462281 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1,8,9* paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0010]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE10350803 |