EP1936744 - Electric switching device with contact element for mounting on the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/26] | Contact element for mounting an electric switching device locking onto a bearing rail | ||
[2011/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Industries GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | [2010/26] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Eaton Industies GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Moeller GmbH Hein-Moeller-Strasse 7-11 53115 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knörrchen, Oliver Heckenrosenpfad 14 50858 Köln / DE | 02 /
Stanke, Stephan Irlenbuscher Strasse 33 53359 Rheinbach / DE | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Müller, Thomas Michael, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Müller, Thomas Michael, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07022524.8 | 20.11.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | DE20061059826 | 19.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006059826 | [2008/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1936744 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1936744 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1936744 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
H01H9/12 (EP);
H01R4/4846 (EP,US);
H01R4/64 (EP);
H01R9/2691 (EP);
H02B1/052 (EP);
H01H50/14 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Schaltgerät mit einer Kontaktelementanordnung zur Befestigung an demselben | [2011/43] | English: | Electric switching device with contact element for mounting on the same | [2011/41] | French: | Appareil électrique avec élément de contact pour la fixation sur le même | [2011/41] |
Former [2008/26] | Kontaktelement zur Befestigung an einem auf einer Tragschiene aufzurastenden, elektrischen Schaltgerät | ||
Former [2008/26] | Contact element for mounting an electric switching device locking onto a bearing rail | ||
Former [2008/26] | Elément de contact destiné à la fixation sur un appareil électrique fixé sur un rail de support | Examination procedure | 09.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 09.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2007 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | IE | 22.02.2012 | LT | 22.02.2012 | LV | 22.02.2012 | MT | 22.02.2012 | PL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | ES | 02.06.2012 | IS | 22.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | GB | 20.11.2012 | LU | 20.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 20.11.2012 | ||
LU | 20.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 20.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
MT | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
GB | 20.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 22.02.2012 | |
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 22.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3732267 (PHOENIX ELEKT); | [A]DE19642086 (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE102004045889 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) | by applicant | DE29905625U |