EP1953922 - Tansceiver for implantable medical devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik CRM Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK CRM Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sutton, Brian P. 5451 Windsor Terrace West Linn, OR 97068 / US | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07023196.4 | 30.11.2007 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | US20070668492 | 30.01.2007 Original published format: US 668492 | [2008/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1953922 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/04, A61N1/372 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
A61N1/37276 (EP,US);
A61N1/3727 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Title | German: | Sende-Empfänger für implantierbare medizinische Geräte | [2008/32] | English: | Tansceiver for implantable medical devices | [2008/32] | French: | Émetteur-récepteur pour dispositifs médicaux implantables | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6223061 (DACUS FARRON L [US], et al) [Y] 2-8 * column 4, lines 1-14 * * column 2, lines 53,54 ** figure 1 *; | [XY]US2006229053 (SIVARD AKE [SE]) [X] 1,9,10 * page 1, paragraphs 2,7,9 * [Y] 2-8 | by applicant | US6223061 | US2006229053 |