EP1911756 - Substituted pyridinyl and pyrimidinyl derivatives as modulators of metabolism and the treatment of disorders related thereto [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2011 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | 21.06.2011 | New entry: Fee payment for extension state | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arena Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 6166 Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hurst, David 8082 Rancho Fanita Drive Santee California 92071 / US | 02 /
Jones, Robert M. 10937 Corte Luz Del Sol San Diego California 92130 / US | 03 /
Wong, Amy Siu-Ting 12956 Cree Drive Poway, CA 92064 / US | 04 /
Lehmann, Juerg 9840 La Tortola Court San Diego California 92129 / US | 05 /
Shin, Young-jun 11051 Ice Skate Place San Diego California 92126 / US | [2008/22] |
Former [2008/16] | 01 /
Hurst, David 8082 Rancho Fanita Drive Santee California 92071 / US | ||
02 /
Jones, Robert M. 10937 Corte Luz Del Sol San Diego California 92130 / US | |||
03 /
Wong, Amy Siu-Ting 11395 Affnity Court, No. 227 San Diego California 92131 / US | |||
04 /
Lehmann, Juerg 9840 La Tortola Court San Diego California 92129 / US | |||
05 /
Shin, Young-jun 11051 Ice Skate Place San Diego California 92126 / US | Representative(s) | Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Wytenburg, Wilhelmus Johannes, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07023528.8 | 09.01.2006 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | US20050642840P | 10.01.2005 Original published format: US 642840 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1911756 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1911756 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1911756 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1911756 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D413/14, A61K31/506, A61K31/4545, A61P3/00 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/44 (KR);
A61K31/505 (KR);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/16] | C07D401/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | YU | 21.12.2007 | Title | German: | Substituierte Pyridinyl- und Pyrimidinylderivate als Modulatoren des Metabolismus und Behandlung von damit zusammenhängenden Störungen | [2008/16] | English: | Substituted pyridinyl and pyrimidinyl derivatives as modulators of metabolism and the treatment of disorders related thereto | [2008/16] | French: | Dérivés de pyridinyle et pyrimidinyle substitués en tant que modulateurs du métabolisme et traitement des désordres associés | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 03.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06733644.6 / EP1732562 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03002544 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [A] 1-67 * the whole document * * page 104; example 5 *; | [A]WO2004041164 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-67 * the whole document * * page 53; examples 1-5 *; | [A]WO2004076413 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-67* the whole document *; | [PY]WO2005007647 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [PY] 10,42-67 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO2005121121 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [PY] 10,42-67 * the whole document * * claim 21 * | by applicant | WO03002544 | WO2004041164 | WO2004076413 | WO2005007647 | WO2005121121 | - PERRY, I. J. ET AL., BMJ, (1995), vol. 310, pages 560 - 564 | - JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 66, page 2 | - HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, PRO-DRUGS AS NOVEL DELIVERY SYSTEMS, vol. 14 | - EXPERT OPIN. THER. PATENTS, (2002), vol. 12, no. 11, pages 1619 - 1630 |