EP2070586 - Beverage dispenser, related refrigerator and method for dispensing a beverage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/25] | Beverage dispenser comprising a gear pump mixing device | ||
[2013/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussel / BE | ||
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussel / BE | ||
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Raketstraat 40 1130 Brussels / BE | ||
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Belgicastraat 17 1930 Zaventem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johansson, Daniel L. Via Teatro Vecchio 9 31015- Conegliano (TV) / IT | 02 /
Hedblom, Susanne Via Verdi 10 31010 - Orsago (TV) / IT | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Markovina, Paolo Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Markovina, Paolo Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | ||
Former [2009/25] | Markovina, Paolo Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | Application number, filing date | 07023986.8 | 11.12.2007 | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2070586 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070586 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, B01F3/20, B01F5/14, B67D1/00, A23L2/54, // F25D23/12 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
A23L2/54 (EP);
B01F23/2363 (EP);
B01F23/237621 (EP);
B01F23/70 (EP);
B01F23/702 (EP);
B01F25/62 (EP);
B67D1/0014 (EP);
B67D1/0021 (EP);
B67D1/0058 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/11 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/25] | B01F3/04, B01F5/14, A23L2/54, B67D1/00, F25D23/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | Getränkespender, darauf bezogene Kühlvorrichtung sowie Verfahren zum Ausgeben eines Getränks | [2013/02] | English: | Beverage dispenser, related refrigerator and method for dispensing a beverage | [2013/02] | French: | Distributeur de boissons, réfrigérateur correspondant et procédé de distribution de boissons | [2013/02] |
Former [2009/25] | Getränkespender aufweisend eine Zahnradpumpenmischvorrichtung | ||
Former [2009/25] | Beverage dispenser comprising a gear pump mixing device | ||
Former [2009/25] | Distributeur de boissons contenant un mélangeur à pompe à engrenages | Examination procedure | 11.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | MT | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | IS | 22.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | IE | 11.12.2013 | LU | 11.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 11.12.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
PT | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB857523 (CLARKE BUILT LTD) [X] 1-12 * page 1, lines 8-62 * * page 2, lines 28-107 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 13; | [XY]US3179382 (KNEDLIK OMAR S) [X] 1-12 * column 1, lines 8-59 * * column 3, lines 18-39,73-75 * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 13; | [XY]GB1207025 (APAW SA [CH]) [X] 1-12 * page 1, lines 10-34 * * page 1, line 64 - page 2, line 65 * * page 2, lines 118-125 * * figures 1,2,4,5 * [Y] 13; | [A]GB2016086 (NORDSON CORP) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [XY]US4264214 (SCHOLL CHARLES H, et al) [X] 1-12 * column 2, lines 29-68 * * column 3, lines 1-5 * * column 4, lines 56-60 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 52 * * abstract * [Y] 13; | [A]EP0190564 (NORDSON CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1580502 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0010] , [0011] , [0018] ** abstract *; | [Y]EP1614986 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] * * abstract *; | [A]US7131826 (FRIEDMAN MITCHELL A [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |