EP1903470 - Tag privacy protecting method, tag device, updater, updater solicitor, programs therefore and recording medium carrying such programs in storage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohkubo, Miyako NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Koutarou NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
Kinoshita, Shingo NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2017/20] |
Former [2008/13] | 01 /
Ohkubo, Miyako NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
Suzuki, Koutarou NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
Kinoshita, Shingo NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/20] |
Former [2010/10] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | Hoffmann, Eckart Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024049.4 | 27.09.2004 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | JP20030334891 | 26.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003334891 | JP20030359157 | 20.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003359157 | JP20030383760 | 13.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003383760 | JP20040124610 | 20.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004124610 | JP20040145366 | 14.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004145366 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903470 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1903470 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1903470 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/60, G06F21/62, G06F21/73, G06Q10/08, G06Q20/34, G06Q20/40, G07F7/10, H04L9/30, H04L9/32 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
G06F21/6245 (EP,US);
G06K19/073 (KR);
G06F12/14 (KR);
G06F21/606 (EP,US);
G06F21/62 (EP,US);
G06F21/73 (EP,US);
G06K17/00 (KR);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
H04L9/3073 (EP,US);
H04L9/32 (KR);
H04L9/3236 (EP,US);
H04L2209/20 (EP,US);
H04L2209/805 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/13] | G06F21/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/20] |
Former [2008/13] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schutz der Etiketten-Privatsphäre, Aktualisierer, Aktualisierungsaufrufprogramm, Programme dafür und Aufzeichnungsmedium mit solchen Programmen | [2008/13] | English: | Tag privacy protecting method, tag device, updater, updater solicitor, programs therefore and recording medium carrying such programs in storage | [2008/13] | French: | Procédé de protection de la confidentialité par marqueur, dispositif de marquage, dispositif de mise à jour, dispositif de demande de mise à jour, programme gérant ces dispositifs et support d'enregistrement pour stockage de ces programmes | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 16.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.10.2016 | 04.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04788209.7 / EP1669877 | Divisional application(s) | EP09013382.8 / EP2141628 | EP09013383.6 / EP2141629 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040788209) is 24.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6012636 (SMITH FRANK E [US]) [X] 1-16 * column 2, line 20 - line 27 * * column 4, line 33 - line 51 * * claim 40 * * column 8, line 11 - line 26 *; | [X]US2002116274 (HIND JOHN R [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,13-16 * page 1, paragraphs 2,14 * * page 2, paragraph 36 * * page 3, paragraphs 41,42 *; | [YP]US2003188171 (DECENZO CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [YP] 1-16* page 2, paragraph 24 *; | [Y] - WEIS S A ET AL, Security and privacy in Radio-frequency identification devices, (20030501), XP002984489 [Y] 1-16 * page 37, line 1 - page 42, line 14 * | Examination | US5657388 |