EP1918335 - Coating composition and optical articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2011 [2011/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi-ken 745-8648 / JP | [2010/02] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mori, Katsuhiro Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | 02 /
Momoda, Junji Tokuyama Corporation 1-1, Mikage-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/19] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07024077.5 | 04.12.2003 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | JP20020354291 | 05.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002354291 | JP20020372835 | 24.12.2002 Original published format: JP 2002372835 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1918335 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1918335 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/00, C09D7/12, C09K9/02, C08J7/04, G02B5/23, G02C7/10 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
C09K9/02 (EP,US);
C09D4/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F230/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/19] | Title | German: | Beschichtungszusammensetzung und optische Artikel | [2008/19] | English: | Coating composition and optical articles | [2008/19] | French: | Composition de revêtement et articles optiques | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03778751.2 / EP1568739 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4435497 (IRVING EDWARD [GB]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1433818 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [PX] 1-9* the whole document * | by applicant | JPS62288830 | JPH0228154 | JPH0311967 | WO9422850 | WO9614596 | JPH08157467 | JPH08176139 | JPH08295690 | JPH09124645 | JPH09218301 | WO9837115 | JPH10298176 | US5914174 | JPH11279171 | JPH11286484 | JPH11322739 | JP2000219687 | JP2000219686 | JP2000219685 | JP2000229976 | JP2000229975 | JP2000229974 | JP2000229973 | JP2000229972 | JP2000256347 | JP2000327676 | JP2000327675 | JP2000344762 | JP2000344761 | JP2000347346 | WO0102449 | JP2001011067 | JP2001011066 | JP2001031670 | JP2001114775 | JP2001227374 | WO03011967 |