EP1936928 - System and method for interfacing a wireless telephone to a personal computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Siemens Communications, Inc. 1001 Yamato Road Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aguais, Alan 10 Forest Mesa 78664 Round Rock / US | 02 /
Coons, Larry 2020 Simbrah Drive Cedar Park, TX 78613 / US | 03 /
Franklin, Deborah 1712 Bradford Court Corinth, TX 76210 / US | 04 /
Jreij, Elie-Antoun 500 Betterman Drive Pflugerville, TX 78660 / US | 05 /
Steinbach, Holger 20815 Alves Dr. Cupertino, CA 95014-1825 / US | [2018/04] |
Former [2008/35] | 01 /
Aguais, Alan 10 Forest Mesa 78664 Round Rock / US | ||
02 /
Coons, Larry 2020 Simbrah Drive Cedar Park, TX 78613 / US | |||
03 /
Franklin, Deborah 1712 Bradford Court 76210 Corinth, TX / US | |||
04 /
Jreij, Elie-Antoun 500 Betterman Drive Pflugerville 78660 TX / US | |||
05 /
Steinbach, Holger 20815 Alves Dr. Cupertino, CA 95014-1825 / US | |||
Former [2008/29] | 01 /
Aguais, Alan 10 Forest Mesa 78664 Round Rock / US | ||
02 /
Larry Coons Desktop Products, 2205 Grand Avenue Parkway 78728 Austin / US | |||
03 /
Franklin, Deborah 1712 Bradford Court 76210 Corinth, TX / US | |||
04 /
Jreij, Elie-Antoun 500 Betterman Drive Pflugerville 78660 TX / US | |||
05 /
Steinbach, Holger 20815 Alves Dr. Cupertino, CA 95014-1825 / US | |||
Former [2008/26] | 01 /
Aguais, Alan 10 Forest Mesa 78664 Round Rock / US | ||
02 /
Larry Coons Desktop Products, 2205 Grand Avenue Parkway 78728 Austin / US | |||
03 /
Franklin, Deborah 1712 Bradford Court 76210 Corinth, TX / US | |||
04 /
Jreij, Elie-Antoun 12324 Little Emily Way 78753 Austin TX / US | |||
05 /
Steinbach, Holger 20815 Alves Dr. Cupertino, CA 95014-1825 / US | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2018/04] |
Former [2008/41] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/26] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024223.5 | 05.09.2002 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | US20010001159 | 31.10.2001 Original published format: US 1159 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1936928 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1936928 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1936928 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/00, H04M1/247, H04M1/725 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
H04M1/72502 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US);
H04M2250/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/26] | H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2018/04] |
Former [2008/26] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Verbindung eines drahtlosen Telefons mit einem PC | [2008/26] | English: | System and method for interfacing a wireless telephone to a personal computer | [2008/26] | French: | Système et procédé pour l'interfaçage d'un téléphone sans fil avec un ordinateur personnel | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.04.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 08.03.2012 | Appeal received No. T1092/12 | 08.03.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.01.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 18.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.01.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02761568.1 / EP1440557 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020761568) is 23.08.2005 | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 19.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5796394 (WICKS JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1-22* paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0054]; figure 4 *; | [A]WO0018025 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-22 * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 27 *; | [X]US6308062 (CHIEN ANDREW YING-TSAI [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 1, line 8 - column 6, line 40; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | US5796394 | WO0018025 |