EP1935645 - Printing plate cassette [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach/Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stroh, Rudolf Jurastrasse 19 73105 Dürnau / DE | 02 /
Gsell, Thomas Wilhelm-Bauer-Strasse 32 1/2 89407 Dillingen / DE | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Ulrich, Thomas manroland AG Intellectual Property (IP) 86219 Augsburg / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2008/26] | Ulrich, Thomas MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG 86219 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024265.6 | 14.12.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | DE20061061452 | 23.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006061452 | [2008/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1935645 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1935645 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
B41F27/1206 (EP,US);
B41P2227/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/29] |
Former [2008/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckplattenkassette | [2008/26] | English: | Printing plate cassette | [2008/26] | French: | Cassette de plaques d'impression | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/45] | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5440985 (SHIMMURA MASATOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP1391300 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH [JP]) [A] * paragraph [0048] *; | [AD]DE102004022089 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]); | [AD]DE102004052021 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [AD] * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2007140268 (BURGESS IND [US], et al) [PX] 1 * page 24 - page 26; figures 19-23 * | by applicant | EP1391300 | DE102004022089 |