EP1932927 - Apparatus for injecting gas into a vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNOLOGICAL RESOURCES PTY. LTD. 120 Collins Street Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tierney, Eric 888 Florence Drive Crescent, PA 15046 / US | 02 /
Cingle III, George 415 W. Starz Road Gibsonia, PA 15044 / US | 03 /
Mattich, Michael 1506 Brownstone Court Tarentum, PA 15084 / US | 04 /
Smith, Todd 708 South Center Street Grove City, PA 16127 / US | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/31] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/25] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024279.7 | 14.12.2007 | [2008/25] | Priority number, date | US20060874982P | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 874982 P | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1932927 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1932927 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1932927 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F27B3/18, F27B3/19, F27B3/20, F27B3/22, F27D3/15, F27D3/18, C21C5/46, C21C5/56, F27D3/16 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
C21C5/4606 (EP,US);
C21C5/56 (EP,US);
F27B3/18 (EP,US);
F27B3/19 (EP,US);
F27B3/20 (EP,US);
F27B3/22 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/25] | C21C5/46, C21C5/56, F27D3/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einspritzen eines Gases in ein Gefäß | [2008/25] | English: | Apparatus for injecting gas into a vessel | [2008/25] | French: | Appareil d'injection d'un gaz dans une cuve | [2008/25] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 22.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2007 | AT | 01.08.2012 | BE | 01.08.2012 | CY | 01.08.2012 | CZ | 01.08.2012 | DK | 01.08.2012 | EE | 01.08.2012 | FI | 01.08.2012 | IT | 01.08.2012 | LT | 01.08.2012 | LV | 01.08.2012 | MT | 01.08.2012 | PL | 01.08.2012 | RO | 01.08.2012 | SI | 01.08.2012 | SK | 01.08.2012 | BG | 01.11.2012 | GR | 02.11.2012 | ES | 12.11.2012 | IS | 01.12.2012 | PT | 03.12.2012 | GB | 14.12.2012 | IE | 14.12.2012 | LU | 14.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
GB | 14.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
LU | 14.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
MT | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
GB | 14.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
IE | 14.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
BG | 01.11.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
IT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
RO | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
SK | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
EE | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
ES | 12.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
DK | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
PT | 03.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
BE | 01.08.2012 | ||
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
LV | 01.08.2012 | ||
PL | 01.08.2012 | ||
SI | 01.08.2012 | ||
GR | 02.11.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
CY | 01.08.2012 | ||
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
IS | 01.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
FI | 01.08.2012 | ||
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 01.08.2012 | |
LT | 01.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU434455B (NIPPON KOKAN) [A] 1-12* figures 1-3 *; | [XAI]WO02083958 (TECH RESOURCES PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,10-12 * abstract * * figures 2,3,7-9 * * page 7, line 35 - page 9, line 17 * [A] 5-9 [I] 3,4 | Examination | WO0164960 | by applicant | US6083296 | US6440356 | US6673305 |