EP1935994 - Apparatus for injecting material into a vessel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNOLOGICAL RESOURCES PTY. LTD. 120 Collins Street Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU | [2008/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hardie, Greg 345 Windermere Road Windermere TAS 7252 / AU | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/26] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07024290.4 | 14.12.2007 | [2008/26] | Priority number, date | US20060874980P | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 874980 P | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1935994 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1935994 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C21C5/46, F27D3/16, F27D3/18, C21C5/56 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
C21C5/4606 (EP,US);
C21C5/56 (EP,US);
F27B3/18 (EP,US);
F27B3/19 (EP,US);
F27B3/20 (EP,US);
F27B3/22 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Einspritzen eines Materials in ein Gefäß | [2008/26] | English: | Apparatus for injecting material into a vessel | [2008/26] | French: | Appareil d'injection d'une matière dans une cuve | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/26] | 11.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 21.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB991120 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) [X] 1-3,5,9 * figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 102 - line 122 * [I] 11; | [XI]US3347660 (SMITH GEORGE H, et al) [X] 1-9,15 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 31; figures 1,3 * [I] 10-14; | [X]GB1367556 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH) [X] 1,6 * page 5, line 45 - line 50 * * figure 1 *; | [XI]WO9207965 (WHELLOCK JOHN GRAHAM [US]) [X] 1-5,9,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 11, line 12 - page 13, line 6 * * page 16, line 20 - page 18, line 23 * * claims 1-13 *[I] 11 | by applicant | WO9631627 | US6440356 | US6673305 | WO2006042363 |